Serhus v. Dalton
Plaintiff: Christine Serhus
Defendant: Michael Dalton
Case Number: 9:2022mc80012
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER: On or before January 21, 2022, Plaintiff shall comply with the Clerk's Notice 3 and file a Notice with the Certification of Judgment for Registration in Another District (Form AO 451) attached. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/19/2022. (dsy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Christine Serhus Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Garcia, Victor)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Certification of Judgment for Registration in Another District (Form AO 451) not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the form attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
January 4, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ebz)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment . Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15291950, filed by Christine Serhus.(Garcia, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serhus v. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Serhus
Represented By: Victor Rafael Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?