Reynolds et al v. TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Petitioner: Scott Richard Reynolds and SRR Fortress Capital, LLC
Respondent: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2023cv80175
Filed: January 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 4/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2023. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before April 3, 2023, Petitioners shall file a response to both the Respondent's Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Vacate and the Counter-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award #15 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/15/2023. (aes)
March 14, 2023 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by TD Ameritrade, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Thomson, Andrew)
March 14, 2023 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to the Respondent's opposition to Petitioners Motion to Vacate by Scott Richard Reynolds, SRR Fortress Capital, LLC. (Berkeley, Lorne)
March 1, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by TD Ameritrade, Inc. re #7 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Removal Status Report (Thomson, Andrew)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/14/2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
February 20, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint re the Notice of Removal , COUNTERCLAIM against Scott Richard Reynolds, SRR Fortress Capital, LLC by TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhbit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Thomson, Andrew)
February 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of Attorney Nicolette T. Beuther's Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #12 , Attorney Nicolette T. Beuther's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/12/2023. (kts)
February 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nicolette T. Beuther. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance at any time. Failure to abide by any court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsel's pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/12/2023. (kts)
February 10, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicolette T. Beuther. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Scott Richard Reynolds, SRR Fortress Capital, LLC. Responses due by 2/24/2023 (Berkeley, Lorne)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicolette T. Beuther. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16314827 filed by SRR Fortress Capital, LLC, Scott Richard Reynolds. Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (pcs)
February 10, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicolette T. Beuther. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16314827 by Scott Richard Reynolds, SRR Fortress Capital, LLC. Responses due by 2/24/2023 (Berkeley, Lorne)
February 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. Respondent shall respond to Petitioners' Petition on or before February 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/5/2023. (kts)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Ex.A by TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Thomson, Andrew)
January 31, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due no later than 3/2/2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
January 31, 2023 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Nicolette T. Beuther, mailing date January 31, 2023, (pt)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD Ameritrade, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toronto-Dominion Bank, Corporate Parent The Charles Schwab Corporation, Corporate Parent TD Ameritrade Online Holdings Corp. for TD Ameritrade, Inc. (Thomson, Andrew)
January 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by TD Ameritrade, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Thomson, Andrew)
January 30, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the completed Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jua)
January 30, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
January 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Pursuant to Fla. Stat. 682.13) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16279637, filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filings Served Upon Defendant, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds et al v. TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Richard Reynolds
Represented By: Lorne Ethan Berkeley
Represented By: Nicolette T. Beuther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SRR Fortress Capital, LLC
Represented By: Lorne Ethan Berkeley
Represented By: Nicolette T. Beuther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Broin Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?