Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC v. Lyndon Southern Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC
Defendant: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, The Fortega Group, Inc., Insurance Company of the South, Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Response Indemnity Company of California and Lotsolutions, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2024cv80820
Filed: July 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2024 Filing 33 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasser, Sarah)
August 19, 2024 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Glasser, Sarah)
August 16, 2024 Filing 31 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Response Indemnity Company of California, The Fortega Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fortegra Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent LOTS Intermediate Co, Corporate Parent Fortegra Group Inc., Corporate Parent Tiptree Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Tiptree Inc., Other Affiliate Joshua Robert Hess, Other Affiliate Mollie G. Hughes for Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Response Indemnity Company of California, The Fortega Group, Inc. (Burke, Emily)
August 13, 2024 Filing 30 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bellaire Services Corporation, Other Affiliate George Lintz, Other Affiliate Amanda Cox for Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Glasser, Sarah)
August 13, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Striking #28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Glasser, Sarah)
August 12, 2024 Filing 28 (STRICKEN per de #29 ) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bellaire Services Corporation for Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Glasser, Sarah) Modified text on 8/14/2024 (pc).
August 12, 2024 Filing 27 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pc)
August 12, 2024 Filing 26 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Response Indemnity Company of California, The Fortega Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fortegra Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent LOTS Intermediate Co, Corporate Parent Tiptree Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Tiptree Inc., Corporate Parent The Fortegra Group, Inc. for Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Response Indemnity Company of California, The Fortega Group, Inc. (Burke, Emily)
August 9, 2024 Filing 25 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pc)
August 9, 2024 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Glasser, Sarah)
August 9, 2024 Filing 23 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Response Indemnity Company of California, The Fortega Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tiptree Inc., Other Affiliate Fortegra Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate LOTS Intermediate Co, Other Affiliate Fortegra Group Inc., Other Affiliate Tiptree Holdings LLC for Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Response Indemnity Company of California, The Fortega Group, Inc. (Burke, Emily)
August 9, 2024 Filing 22 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties for discovery only. Filed by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Glasser, Sarah)
July 29, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 21 Order. Blue Ridge Indemnity Company response/answer due 8/22/2024; Insurance Company of the South response/answer due 8/22/2024; Lotsolutions, Inc. response/answer due 8/22/2024; Lyndon Southern Insurance Company response/answer due 8/22/2024; Response Indemnity Company of California response/answer due 8/22/2024; The Fortega Group, Inc. response/answer due 8/22/2024.( Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/30/2024), Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Blue Ridge Indemnity Company response/answer due 8/22/2024; Insurance Company of the South response/answer due 8/22/2024; Lotsolutions, Inc. response/answer due 8/22/2024; Lyndon Southern Insurance Company response/answer due 8/22/2024; Response Indemnity Company of California response/answer due 8/22/2024; The Fortega Group, Inc. response/answer due 8/22/2024. (amb)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and to Submit Joint Scheduling Report. Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint by August 22, 2024 and the parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report by August 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/29/2024. (cbn)
July 29, 2024 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and to Submit Joint Scheduling Report by Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Response Indemnity Company of California, The Fortega Group, Inc.. Attorney Emily Carson Burke added to party Blue Ridge Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Carson Burke added to party Insurance Company of the South(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Carson Burke added to party Lotsolutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Carson Burke added to party Lyndon Southern Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Carson Burke added to party Response Indemnity Company of California(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Carson Burke added to party The Fortega Group, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burke, Emily)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/9/2024 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
July 12, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. Insurance Company of the South served on 7/11/2024, response/answer due 8/1/2024. (Glasser, Sarah)
July 12, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. Response Indemnity Company of California served on 7/11/2024, response/answer due 8/1/2024. (Glasser, Sarah)
July 12, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. Lyndon Southern Insurance Company served on 7/11/2024, response/answer due 8/1/2024. (Glasser, Sarah)
July 12, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. Lotsolutions, Inc. served on 7/11/2024, response/answer due 8/1/2024. (Glasser, Sarah)
July 12, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. The Fortega Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2024, response/answer due 8/1/2024. (Glasser, Sarah)
July 12, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. Blue Ridge Indemnity Company served on 7/11/2024, response/answer due 8/1/2024. (Glasser, Sarah)
July 8, 2024 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to The Fortega Group, Inc.(wce)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Barry Himmelstein. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/8/2024. (cbn)
July 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) The Fortegra Group, Inc.) (Glasser, Sarah)
July 8, 2024 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summonses will not be issued. Summons at DE #7 at 2 for Defendant: The Fortegra Group, Inc do not match the Defendant's name on the summonses attached. (wce)
July 8, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, Insurance Company of the South, Lotsolutions, Inc., Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, and Response Indemnity Company of California. (wce)
July 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, #2 Summon(s) The Fortegra Group, Inc., #3 Summon(s) Response Indemnity Company of California, #4 Summon(s) Insurance Company of the South, #5 Summon(s) Blue Ridge Indemnity Company, #6 Summon(s) LotSolutions, Inc.) (Glasser, Sarah)
July 8, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Barry Himmelstein. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17658018 by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. Responses due by 7/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasser, Sarah)
July 3, 2024 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Barry Himmelstein, mailing date July 3, 2024, (pt)
July 3, 2024 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. Summons(es) NOT issued for the following reasons: only one summons was provided for multiple defendants no mail to address on the summons please refile the proposed summons one for each defendant and the name and address of each defendant needs to be on the front of each summons. (pc)
July 3, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Exhibits. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pc)
July 3, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
July 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17652520, filed by Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Freidin, Jonathan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/3/2024) (pc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2024: #3 Exhibit) (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC v. Lyndon Southern Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fortega Group, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the South
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Indemnity Company
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Response Indemnity Company of California
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotsolutions, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellaire Multifamily Property Management LLC
Represented By: Barry R. Himmelstein
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Freidin
Represented By: Sarah Jaffe Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?