P.N. v. FOREST TRAIL ACADEMY, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: P.N.
Defendant: Randall Cook, CORE SOLUTIONS, LLC,, Lisa Cook, Randy Stewman, Jodi Stewman, Forest Trail Academy, LLC, United Secure Youth Transport Agency, LLC and Atlantis Leadership Academy, LLC
Case Number: 9:2024cv81375
Filed: November 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM by P.N.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wald, Kimberly)
December 18, 2024 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Atlantis Leadership Academy, LLC, and Forest Trail Academy, LLC. (wce)
December 18, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by P.N. re #1 Complaint, filed by P.N. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Wald, Kimberly)
December 10, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Kimberly Lauren Wald (pt)
December 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Kimberly Lauren Wald (Wald, Kimberly)
December 3, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Atlantis Leadership Academy, LLC, CORE SOLUTIONS, LLC,, Lisa Cook, Randall Cook, Forest Trail Academy, LLC, Jodi Stewman, Randy Stewman, and UNITED SECURE YOUTH TRANSPORT AGENCY, LLC,. (wce)
December 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by P.N. re #1 Complaint, filed by P.N. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s)) (Wald, Kimberly)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(A) and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Within two weeks of the date upon which any one defendant appears in this action, the parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the above-styled matter is transferred to the calendar of Judge Robin L. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Therefore, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that all pleadings hereinafter filed shall bear the following case number 24-81375-CV-ROSENBERG, thereby indicating the Judge to whom all pleadings shall be routed or otherwise brought for attention. Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/21/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Kimberly Lauren Wald (pt)
November 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Kimberly Lauren Wald (Wald, Kimberly)
November 1, 2024 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 1, 2024 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Palm Beach (Office - West Palm Beach) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (amb)
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PN, Minor against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17953652, filed by Minor NP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Wald, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.N. v. FOREST TRAIL ACADEMY, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORE SOLUTIONS, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Stewman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Stewman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Trail Academy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Secure Youth Transport Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantis Leadership Academy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.N.
Represented By: Kimberly Lauren Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?