United States of America v. Milton et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Balfore Milton and Doreen Patterson
Case Number: 9:2025cv80110
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
March 21, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Balfore Milton served on 3/4/2025, response/answer due 3/25/2025. (Marquez, Jennifer)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/24/2025. (bbk)
February 24, 2025 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Marquez, Jennifer)
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND PERMITTING REPLEADING re #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America, (Amended Complaint due by 2/25/2025.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/3/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
January 27, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Balfore Milton, Doreen Patterson. (cwc)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Balfore Milton, #3 Summon(s) Doreen Patterson, #4 Exhibit "A")(Marquez, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Milton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Margolis Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfore Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?