TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC. v. BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP.
Plaintiff: TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP
Case Number: 9:2025cv80146
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David S Leibowitz
Referring Judge: Ryon M McCabe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until April 11, 2025 to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 3/25/2025. (sim)
March 25, 2025 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, by BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP. (Kleppin, Chris)
March 25, 2025 Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe added events only (NEF's) per DE #12 Order. Motion referred to Judge Ryon M. McCabe. (mf)
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request to Convert Such Motion into one for Summary JudgmentDefendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (if Converted) filed by BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP. Motions referred to Judge Ryon M. McCabe. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
March 21, 2025 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request to Convert Such Motion into one for Summary JudgmentDefendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (if Converted) filed by TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC.. Replies due by 3/28/2025. (Burack, Seth)
March 7, 2025 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request to Convert Such Motion into one for Summary Judgment, Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (if Converted) by BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP. Attorney Chris Kleppin added to party BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/21/2025. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dr. Alan Kutner)(Kleppin, Chris)
February 19, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC.. BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP served on 2/14/2025, response/answer due 3/7/2025. (Burack, Seth)
February 10, 2025 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Toll Holdings Inc. Toll Brothers, Inc. for TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC. (Burack, Seth)
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Brett A. Berman. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz (dsf)
February 4, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brett A. Berman. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18175541 by TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC.. Responses due by 2/18/2025. (Burack, Seth)
February 3, 2025 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Brett A. Berman, mailing date February 3, 2025, (pt)
February 3, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC. for property located at Palm Beach County ; Grantees: Boca Raton Executive Country Club Corp and all others whom it may concern (Burack, Seth)
February 3, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP. (scn)
January 31, 2025 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP., a Florida Corporation. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18170248, filed by TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A. Agreements)(Burack, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC. v. BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOLL SOUTHEAST LP COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Brett A. Berman
Represented By: Seth Brian Burack
Represented By: Selene Citlali Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOCA RATON EXECUTIVE COUNTRY CLUB CORP
Represented By: Chris Kleppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?