JAR-BET, L.L.C.
Debtor: JAR-BET, L.L.C.
Trustee: Robert M. Matson - Ch 11 Sub V
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee - MAC
Case Number: 1:2021bk10519
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Austin E Carter
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 31 Application for Compensation for Robert M. Matson, Subchapter V Trustee. Objections due by 11/22/2021 plus an additional 3 (three) days if served by mail. filed by Robert M. Matson - Ch 11 Sub V Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 02:00 PM - Albany Courthouse. Court to hold submitted order for review until 11/26/2021. (Matson, Robert)
October 27, 2021 Filing 30 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/27/2021 3:05:58 PM ]. File Size [ 2484 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:21 ]. (CourtSpeak).
October 27, 2021 Hearing Held--STATUS CONFERENCE HELD (related document(s)#9 Order to Obtain a Status Conference Date (Subchapter V), #22 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C.). (Vaughn, V.)
October 23, 2021 Filing 29 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#27 Memo Regarding Monthly Report). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/23/2021. (Admin.)
October 22, 2021 Filing 28 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor First State Bank Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 02:00 PM - Albany Courthouse. (Wilder, Daniel)
October 21, 2021 Filing 27 Memo Regarding Monthly Report to the US Trustee;. DIP Report due by 11/22/2021. (Thomas, C.)
October 20, 2021 Filing 26 Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee - MAC Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 02:00 PM - Albany Courthouse. (Fenimore, Robert)
October 9, 2021 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#24 Order Scheduling Hearing). No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/09/2021. (Admin.)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Scheduling Hearing (related document(s)#9 Order to Obtain a Status Conference Date (Subchapter V). Status hearing to be held on 10/27/2021 at 03:00 PM at Macon Courtroom B. Pre-Status Report Due By 10/13/2021. Signed on 10/7/2021 (Gordon, L.)
October 7, 2021 Hearing Set (related document(s)#22 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C.). Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 at 03:00 PM at Macon Courtroom B (Gordon, L.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Service filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C. (related document(s)#21 Notice of Hearing, #22 Pre-Status Conference Report) (Boyer, Wesley)
October 6, 2021 Filing 22 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C. (Boyer, Wesley)
October 6, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C. (related document(s)#9 Order to Obtain a Status Conference Date (Subchapter V)) Status hearing to be held on 10/27/2021 at 03:00 PM at Macon Courtroom B. (Boyer, Wesley)
October 5, 2021 Meeting of Creditors Held filed by U.S. Trustee - MAC (related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12) (Fenimore, Robert)
September 29, 2021 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#18 Order on Application to Employ). No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/29/2021. (Admin.)
September 29, 2021 Filing 19 Schedules A-J, Original without certificate of service to additional creditors or codebtors, Fee Amount $32, Original Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Original Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual, Equity Security Holders , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C. (Boyer, Wesley)
September 29, 2021 Receipt of Schedules A-J(# 21-10519) [misc,schaj] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17859985. Fee amount 32.00. (re:Doc#19) (U.S. Treasury)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Application to Employ Boyer Terry LLC (Related Doc #16) Signed on 9/27/2021. (Thomas, C.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#15 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/17/2021. (Admin.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 Application to Employ Boyer Terry LLC as Attorneys for Debtor filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C. (Boyer, Wesley)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Related Doc #14) Signed on 9/14/2021. Deadline to file deficient filings extended to 9/29/2021. (Thomas, C.)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information filed by Debtor JAR-BET, L.L.C. (Boyer, Wesley)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#9 Order to Obtain a Status Conference Date (Subchapter V)). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/10/2021. (Admin.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#8 Order of DIP Duties). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/10/2021. (Admin.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 09/10/2021. (Admin.)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#5 Court's Notice of Deficient Filings). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/09/2021. (Admin.)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order to Obtain a Status Conference Date (Subchapter V) (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Signed on 9/8/2021 (Gordon, L.)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order that the Debtor File Reports and Summaries on a Monthly Basis . DIP Report due by 10/20/2021. Signed on 9/8/2021 (Gordon, L.)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 Original Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at U.S. Trustee Teleconference. Proofs of Claims due by 11/12/2021. (Gordon, L.)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Original Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at UST Teleconference. Proofs of Claims due by 11/12/2021. (Gordon, L.). See #7 for image
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Court's Notice Regarding the Following Deficient Filings: Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Federal Income Tax Return, Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Equity Security Holders, App To Employ. Deficient Filings or Request for Hearing due by 9/21/2021. (Gant, D)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Elizabeth A. Hardy by Elizabeth A. Hardy filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee - MAC (Hardy, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Robert G. Fenimore by Robert G. Fenimore filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee - MAC (Fenimore, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Judge Austin E. Carter added to case. (Gant, D)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appointment of Trustee . Robert M. Matson - Ch 11 Sub V added to the case. filed by U.S. Trustee - MAC (Hardy, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 filed by JAR-BET, L.L.C. Atty Disclosure Statement due 09/17/2021. Schedule B due 09/17/2021. Schedule A/B due 09/17/2021. Schedule D due 09/17/2021. Schedule F due 09/17/2021. Schedule E/F due 09/17/2021. Schedule G due 09/17/2021. Schedule H due 09/17/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 09/17/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 09/17/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 09/17/2021. Ch 11 Plan Exclusivity Period re: FRBP 1121 Expires On 01/1/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 01/1/2022.
September 3, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-10519) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17813872. Fee amount 1738.00. (re:Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: JAR-BET, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: JAR-BET, L.L.C.
Represented By: Wesley J. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Robert M. Matson - Ch 11 Sub V
Represented By: Robert M. Matson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee - MAC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hardy
Represented By: Robert G. Fenimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?