TLA Timber, LLC
Debtor: TLA Timber, LLC
Trustee: Robert M. Matson - Ch 11 Sub V
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee - MAC
Case Number: 5:2021bk51009
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: James P Smith
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 36 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#34 Memo Regarding Monthly Report). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2021. (Admin.)
December 22, 2021 Filing 35 Motion for Relief from Stay Fee Amount $188, filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 11:00 AM - Macon Courtroom A. (Bingham, Ron)
December 22, 2021 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 21-51009) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A18020589. Fee amount 188.00. (re:Doc#35) (U.S. Treasury)
December 21, 2021 Filing 34 Memo Regarding Monthly Report to the US Trustee;. DIP Report due by 1/20/2022. (Ferguson, L)
December 17, 2021 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Anthony F. Giuliano filed by Creditor Pearl Capital Funding, LLC (Giuliano, Anthony)
December 17, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Withdrawal filed by Creditor Pearl Capital Funding, LLC (Giuliano, Anthony). Related document(s) #31 Creditor Request for Notices filed by Creditor Pearl Capital Funding, LLC. Modified on 12/20/2021 (Ferguson, L). linked the correct document
December 15, 2021 Special Note from the Court: Please see case # 21-50996 to hear audio of Pre-Status Conference held on 12/15/2021. (related document(s)#26 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC). (Taylor-Owens, M.)
December 15, 2021 Hearing Held (related document(s)#26 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC). Order/Withdrawal Follow-up Due: 1/5/2022. (Thomas, R.) Pre-Status Report Given, Case to Proceed.
December 6, 2021 Filing 31 Creditor Request for Notices filed by Creditor Pearl Capital Funding, LLC (Giuliano, Anthony) Modified on 12/20/2021 (Ferguson, L). withdrawn
December 4, 2021 Filing 30 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#29 Order on Application to Employ). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2021. (Admin.)
December 2, 2021 Filing 28 Certificate of Service filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC (related document(s)#26 Pre-Status Conference Report, #27 Notice of Hearing) (Boyer, Wesley)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Granting Application to Employ Wesley Boyer, Boyer Terry LLC (Related Doc #25) Signed on 12/1/2021. (Bryan, M.)
December 1, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC (related document(s)#26 Pre-Status Conference Report) Status hearing to be held on 12/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at Macon Courtroom A. (Boyer, Wesley)
December 1, 2021 Filing 26 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC (Boyer, Wesley)
November 29, 2021 Filing 25 Application to Employ Boyer Terry LLC as Attorneys for Debtor filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit) (Boyer, Wesley)
November 24, 2021 Filing 24 Schedules A-J, I hereby certify that no additional creditors or codebtors have been added since the filing of the original matrix,, I hereby certify that no additional creditors or codebtors have been added since the filing of the original matrix Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , I hereby certify that no additional creditors or codebtors have been added since the filing of the original matrix Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC (Boyer, Wesley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kirby R. Moore filed by Creditor Exchange Bank (Moore, Kirby)
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#20 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/17/2021. (Admin.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#19 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/17/2021. (Admin.)
November 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Related Doc #18) Signed on 11/14/2021. Deadline to file deficient filings extended to 11/24/2021. (Ferguson, L)
November 14, 2021 Filing 19 Consent Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #16) Signed on 11/14/2021. (Ferguson, L)
November 11, 2021 Filing 18 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC (Boyer, Wesley)
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ron C. Bingham II filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (Bingham, Ron)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor TLA Timber, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Budget #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Boyer, Wesley)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#9 Order to Obtain a Status Conference Date (Subchapter V)). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/04/2021. (Admin.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#8 Order of DIP Duties). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/04/2021. (Admin.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 Response with opposition /Objection of Creditor Commercial Credit Group Inc. to Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Commercial Credit Group Inc. (Godfrey, Gwendolyn)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#5 Court's Notice of Deficient Filings). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gwendolyn J. Godfrey filed by Creditor Commercial Credit Group Inc. (Godfrey, Gwendolyn)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order to Obtain a Status Conference Date (Subchapter V) (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Signed on 11/2/2021 (Ferguson, L)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order that the Debtor File Reports and Summaries on a Monthly Basis . DIP Report due by 12/20/2021. Signed on 11/2/2021 (Ferguson, L)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert G. Fenimore filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee - MAC (Fenimore, Robert)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Elizabeth A. Hardy filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee - MAC (Hardy, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Court's Notice Regarding the Following Deficient Filings: Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation. Deficient Filings or Request for Hearing due by 11/15/2021. (Gant, D)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Original Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/30/2021 at 01:30 PM at U.S. Trustee Teleconference. Proofs of Claims due by 1/7/2022. (Ferguson, L)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Original Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/30/2021 at 01:30 PM at U.S. Trustee Teleconference. Proofs of Claims due by 1/7/2022. (Ferguson, L) Modified on 11/1/2021 (Ferguson, L). not served
November 1, 2021 Judge James P. Smith added to case. (Jones, J.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appointment of Trustee . Robert M. Matson - Ch 11 Sub V added to the case. filed by U.S. Trustee - MAC (Hardy, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 filed by TLA Timber, LLC Atty Disclosure Statement due 11/12/2021. Schedule B due 11/12/2021. Schedule A/B due 11/12/2021. Schedule D due 11/12/2021. Schedule F due 11/12/2021. Schedule E/F due 11/12/2021. Schedule G due 11/12/2021. Schedule H due 11/12/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/12/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/12/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 11/12/2021. Ch 11 Plan Exclusivity Period re: FRBP 1121 Expires On 02/28/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 02/28/2022.
October 29, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-51009) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17917643. Fee amount 1738.00. (re:Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: TLA Timber, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: TLA Timber, LLC
Represented By: Wesley J. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Robert M. Matson - Ch 11 Sub V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee - MAC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hardy
Represented By: Robert G. Fenimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?