WRIGHT v. SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION
Plaintiff: MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR
Defendant: SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION
Special Master: BERNARD GROFMAN
Case Number: 1:2014cv00042
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Albany Office
County: Sumter
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #326 Motion to Vacate. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/5/2021. (bcl)
December 21, 2020 Filing 326 JOINT MOTION to Vacate #324 Order, #323 Judgment on Attorney Fees, #322 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SELLS, BRYAN)
December 9, 2020 Filing 325 MANDATE of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court as to #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #279 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
December 7, 2020 Filing 324 ***VACATED PER #327 ORDER*** ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a motion for attorney's fees on appeal no later than 12/29/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/7/2020. (bcl) Modified on 1/5/2021 (bcl).
December 7, 2020 Filing 323 ***VACATED PER #327 ORDER*** JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. (bcl) Modified on 1/5/2021 (bcl).
December 7, 2020 Filing 322 ***VACATED PER #327 ORDER*** ORDER granting in part and denying in part #306 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/7/2020. (bcl) Modified on 1/5/2021 (bcl).
December 1, 2020 Filing 321 TAXATION OF COSTS in the amount of $450.00 against Defendant (dwb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 320 USCA L- Copy of Appllee's Unopposed Motion to Transfer re #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #279 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (bcl)
November 30, 2020 Filing 319 USCA Order/Opinion as to #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #279 Notice of Appeal re Appellee's Unopposed Motion to Transfer filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
October 27, 2020 Filing 318 USCA Order/Opinion as to #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #279 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
July 27, 2020 Filing 317 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #306 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: plaintiff's responses to the county's line-by-line objections, #2 Exhibit 2: Sumter County's legal bills, #3 Exhibit 3: Weber declaration)(SELLS, BRYAN)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #315 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/22/2020. (sbd)
July 21, 2020 Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 314 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #306 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Tyson Declaration), #2 Exhibit B (Reid Declaration), #3 Exhibit C (Line-Item Objections))(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER denying #308 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/29/2020. (bcl)
June 22, 2020 Filing 312 NOTICE of Oral Argument in the Court of Appeals by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #309 Order for Response to Motion, (SELLS, BRYAN)
May 20, 2020 Filing 311 REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #308 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #306 MOTION for Attorney Fees (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
May 4, 2020 Filing 310 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #308 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #306 MOTION for Attorney Fees (SELLS, BRYAN)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER for Response to Motion re: #308 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #306 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 4/30/2020. (bcl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 308 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #306 MOTION for Attorney Fees by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by KATHERINE L MCKNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
April 22, 2020 Filing 307 BILL OF COSTS by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit page 1 of docket sheet, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Exhibit Wright declaration)(SELLS, BRYAN)
April 22, 2020 Filing 306 MOTION for Attorney Fees by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sells declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ho declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Young declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Khondoker declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Wright declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - County's discovery response, #7 Exhibit 7 - Grofman email, #8 Exhibit 8 - minutes of county commission meeting, #9 Exhibit 9 - minutes of county commission meeting, #10 Exhibit 10 - minutes of county commission meeting, #11 Exhibit 11 - minutes of county commission meeting)(SELLS, BRYAN)
April 16, 2020 Filing 305 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG added to party MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR(pty:pla) (YOUNG, SEAN)
April 10, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #240 Notice of Appeal, #279 Notice of Appeal, #207 Notice of Appeal, & #304 Notice. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (bcl)
April 9, 2020 Filing 304 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION,amending #207 Notice of Appeal, #240 Notice of Appeal, #279 Notice of Appeal (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #287 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting #287 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting #287 Motion to Amend/Correct. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 4/8/2020 (bcl)
April 7, 2020 Filing 302 Letter regarding entrance of order resolving Plaintiff's Rule 59 motion. re #287 MOTION for Reconsideration re #277 OrderMOTION to Alter Judgment re: #277 Order, #280 JudgmentMOTION to Amend/Correct #277 Order (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
April 7, 2020 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #279 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (bcl)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting #296 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney AKLIMA KHONDOKER and LAUGHLIN MCDONALD terminated; granting #299 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney AKLIMA KHONDOKER and LAUGHLIN MCDONALD terminated Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/31/2020 (bcl)
March 3, 2020 Filing 300 USCA LETTER regarding reinstatement of appeal re #279 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
February 28, 2020 Filing 299 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by AKLIMA KHONDOKER.(KHONDOKER, AKLIMA)
February 28, 2020 Filing 298 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. re #279 Notice of Appeal (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
February 28, 2020 Filing 297 MANDATE of USCA DISMISSING appeal as to #279 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
February 26, 2020 Filing 296 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by LAUGHLIN MCDONALD.(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
February 25, 2020 Filing 295 RESPONSE to #287 Motion, #288 Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #287 MOTION for Reconsideration re #277 OrderMOTION to Alter Judgment re: #277 Order, #280 JudgmentMOTION to Amend/Correct #277 Order, #288 Order for Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13-2020 FINAL114CV42 WRIGHT V UMPTER BOE)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE) Modified on 2/26/2020 to add text (bcl).
February 21, 2020 Filing 294 Proposed Revised Map 3 by BERNARD GROFMAN re #289 Order. (bcl)
February 20, 2020 Filing 293 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #288 Order for Response to Motion, (SELLS, BRYAN)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #291 Motion for Extension of Time for Attorney's Fees and Expenses. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 2/19/2020 (bcl)
February 19, 2020 Filing 291 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Bill of Costs. by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
February 18, 2020 Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/13/2020, before DISTRICT JUDGE W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (slg)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER directing Professor Grofman to provide the Court a revised version of the Map 3 attachment immediately and no later than Friday, February 21, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 2/14/2020. (bcl)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER for Response to Motion re: #287 MOTION for Reconsideration re #277 OrderMOTION to Alter Judgment re: #277 Order, #280 JudgmentMOTION to Amend/Correct #277 Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 2/14/2020. (bcl)
February 11, 2020 Filing 287 MOTION for Reconsideration re #277 Order, MOTION to Alter Judgment re: #277 Order, #280 Judgment (), MOTION to Amend/Correct #277 Order () by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SELLS, BRYAN)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #283 Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 2/6/2020. (bcl)
February 6, 2020 Filing 285 SUPPLEMENTAL Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #284 Amended Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: W. Louis Sands. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (bcl)
February 5, 2020 Filing 284 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION,amending #279 Notice of Appeal (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
February 4, 2020 Filing 283 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
February 3, 2020 Filing 282 USCA Case Number 20-10394-H re #279 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (bcl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 281 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #277 Order, #278 Judgment, #198 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, #279 Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: W. Louis Sands. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. Fee: Paid. (bcl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 280 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR against SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
January 31, 2020 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #240 Notice of Appeal, #207 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (bcl)
January 31, 2020 Appeal Instructions re #279 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 2/18/2020.(bcl)
January 30, 2020 Filing 279 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #277 Order, #278 Judgment, #198 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Filing fee $ 505, Receipt No.: AGAMDC-3376659. (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
January 29, 2020 Filing 278 JUDGMENT of dismissal. (bcl)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER regarding the Court's remedial proceedings. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/29/2020. (bcl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2020: #1 Map 3) (bcl).
January 29, 2020 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #240 Notice of Appeal, #207 Notice of Appeal,. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (bcl)
January 13, 2020 Filing 276 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: FinalPublic Hearing held on 1/13/2020 Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (gda)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DALE HO (nop)
December 20, 2019 Filing 274 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3346115, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Aklima Khondoker, Georgia Bar No.: 410345. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Dale Ho from SDNY)(HO, DALE)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/13/2020 at 3:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/19/2019. (mdm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 271 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #267 Order (SELLS, BRYAN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 270 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #267 Order (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
November 29, 2019 Filing 269 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #267 Order (SELLS, BRYAN)
November 29, 2019 Filing 268 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #267 Order (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
November 22, 2019 Filing 272 Report of the Special Master (Attachments: #1 Report Part 2, #2 Report Part 3, #3 Report Part 4, #4 Report Part 5, #5 Report Part 6, #6 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 1, #7 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 2, #8 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 3, #9 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 4, #10 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 5, #11 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 6, #12 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 7, #13 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 8, #14 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 9, #15 Exhibit Colored Maps Part 10, #16 Exhibit Correction to Map)(bcl)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER appointing special master Bernard Grofman. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 9/20/2019. (bcl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 266 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #261 Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SELLS, BRYAN)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER advising the Parties that they may file a proposed modified scheduling order for the remedial phase of this case no later than September 18, 2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 9/12/2019. (bcl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 264 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #261 Order (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
September 9, 2019 Filing 263 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #261 Order (SELLS, BRYAN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 262 Declaration of Bernard Grofman, Ph.D. by BERNARD GROFMAN re #261 Order. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(bcl)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER identifying special master. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/14/2019. (bcl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 260 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #258 Order (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 259 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #254 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grofman short CV)(SELLS, BRYAN)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER directing Sumter County to file a reply brief to #256 RESPONSE to Court Order no later than 8/1/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/19/2019. (bcl)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting #255 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/17/2019. (bcl)
July 17, 2019 Filing 256 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #254 Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit declaration of Frederick G. McBride, Ph.D.)(SELLS, BRYAN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 255 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File the names of special-master candidates. by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a supplemental brief no later than 7/17/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/27/2019. (bcl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 252 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re Status Conference, (SELLS, BRYAN)
June 12, 2019 Filing 253 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #251 Motion for Status Conference. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/12/19 (jbk)
June 12, 2019 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Status Conference held on 6/12/2019. The Court heard from counsel as to outstanding issues and gave direction as to how the case would proceed. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING re #251 MOTION for a status conference : TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 6/12/2019 03:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. [NOTE: Atty Sells will be responsible for contacting the participants and setting up the conference. When everyone is connected, please telephone Chambers @ 229.431.2505 to proceed with the conference. (jbk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 251 MOTION for a status conference by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 250 USCA Order/Opinion as to #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER denying without prejudice #246 Motion to Reopen Case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/28/2019 (bcl)
January 2, 2019 Filing 248 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #246 MOTION to Reopen Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - appellant's brief in opposition to motion for a limited remand)(SELLS, BRYAN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 247 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #246 MOTION to Reopen Case (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 246 MOTION to Reopen Case by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Appellant's Brief)(SELLS, BRYAN)
October 23, 2018 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #240 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (bcl)
October 11, 2018 Filing 245 USCA LETTER regarding Notice of Court Action re #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
October 11, 2018 Filing 244 USCA LETTER re #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
August 24, 2018 Filing 243 USCA Order as to #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. To the extent Appellant seeks a stay or vacatur of the district courts injunction, the motion is DENIED. To the extent Appellant seeks consolidation of case nos. 18-11510 and 18-13510, the motion is GRANTED. (mdm)
August 23, 2018 Filing 242 USCA Case Number 18-13510-H re #240 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (bcl)
August 22, 2018 Filing 241 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #218 MOTION for an Injunction Pending Appeal, #238 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, #240 Notice of Appeal, #237 Order Judge Appealed: W. Louis Sands. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. Fee Paid: Paid. (bcl)
August 22, 2018 Appeal Instructions re #240 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 9/10/2018 (bcl)
August 21, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #238 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, #237 Order by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Filing fee $ 505, Receipt No.: 113G-2952922. (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER directing the Clerk to return the complete record of this case, including matters filed and entered after remand, to the Circuit. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/20/2018. Order emailed to USCA.(bcl)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #218 Motion for an Injunction Pending Appeal. The Sumter County Board of Education election scheduled for November 6, 2018 is ENJOINED and will be reset at a later date. Defendant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration is hereby ORDERED to promptly inform voters and all other necessary parties that the November 6, 2018 election for the Sumter County Board of Education has been cancelled and will be rescheduled. Defendant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration is ENJOINED from tabulating any votes cast in the November 6, 2018 election for any position on the Sumter County Board of Education. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/20/2018 (bcl)
August 20, 2018 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #207 Notice of Appeal,. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (bcl)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER re #218 MOTION for an Injunction Pending Appeal filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 08/17/2018. (mdm)
August 17, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #236 Response to Motion filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION ); For future reference, all document include a description of exhibit(s). Do not refile. (bcl)
August 16, 2018 Filing 236 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #218 MOTION for an Injunction Pending Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Map)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE) Modified on 8/17/2018 to add text (bcl).
August 16, 2018 Filing 235 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/15/2018, before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (slg)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER memorializing the Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/16/2018. (bcl)
August 15, 2018 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2018. Written Order to be entered setting out discussions and directions by the Court. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk)
August 14, 2018 Filing 233 NOTICE Regarding November Election by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Brady)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #229 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/13/2018. (bcl)
August 13, 2018 Filing 231 RESPONSE to Court Order re 227 Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE) Modified on 8/14/2018 to add text (bcl).
August 13, 2018 Filing 230 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re 227 Order on Motion for Hearing,, (SELLS, BRYAN)
August 13, 2018 Filing 229 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for reply in support of emergency motion for a stay pending appeal by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
August 13, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #228 Reply to Response to Motion filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR ); Document exceeds page limit. Leave of court required before filing. (bcl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 228 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #218 MOTION for an Injunction Pending Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - declaration of Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr., #2 Exhibit B - declaration of Michael Barnes)(SELLS, BRYAN)
August 10, 2018 Filing 227 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #226 Motion for Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/15/2018 @ 03:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/10/18. [NOTE: Atty Sells will be responsible for contacting the participants and setting up the conference. When everyone is connected, please telephone Chambers @ 229.430.8553 and we will proceed with the conference.] (jbk)
August 9, 2018 Filing 226 MOTION for Hearing re #225 USCA Order by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
August 9, 2018 Filing 225 USCA Order of Remand as to #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (bcl)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER finding that a hearing would be unnecessary in view of the available record and prior orders of the Court. The Parties shall comply with the expedited briefing schedule re #220 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/8/2018. (bcl)
August 7, 2018 Filing 223 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #218 MOTION for an Injunction Pending Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Brady)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
August 3, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO ORDER by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #220 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
August 3, 2018 Filing 221 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #220 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (SELLS, BRYAN)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #219 Motion to Expedite. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/2/2018. (bcl)
July 31, 2018 Filing 219 MOTION to expedite re #218 MOTION for an Injunction Pending Appeal by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
July 31, 2018 Filing 218 EMERGENCY MOTION for an Injunction Pending Appeal by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying in part and denying in part without prejudice #215 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will consider the request for a further stay of elections at a later date. The remainder of the motion is denied. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 07/23/2018. (mdm)
July 11, 2018 Filing 216 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #215 MOTION for Reconsideration re #214 Order, (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
June 27, 2018 Filing 215 MOTION for Reconsideration re #214 Order, by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER modifying #204 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to remove is self-imposed July 23, 2018 deadline for considering interim boundaries. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/21/2018. (bcl)
May 24, 2018 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #207 Notice of Appeal,. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (bcl)
May 9, 2018 Filing 213 USCA Order/Opinion as to #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (bcl)
May 4, 2018 Filing 212 USCA Order/Opinion as to #207 Notice of Appeal filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (mdm)
April 20, 2018 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. re #207 Notice of Appeal, NO TRANSCRIPTS ORDERED (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
April 16, 2018 Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/28/2018, Status Conference before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (slg)
April 12, 2018 Filing 209 USCA Case Number 18-11510-H re #207 Notice of Appeal, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (bcl)
April 12, 2018 Filing 208 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #207 Notice of Appeal, #204 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #198 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Judge Appealed: W. Louis Sands. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. Fee Paid: Paid. (bcl)
April 12, 2018 Appeal Instructions re #207 Notice of Appeal,. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 4/30/2018 (bcl)
April 11, 2018 Filing 207 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #204 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #198 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Filing fee $ 505, Receipt No.: 113G-2851455. (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER overruling #205 Notice (Other), filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. The injunction outlined in docket entry #204 remains in effect. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 4/11/2018. (bcl)
April 6, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE of Objections to Court's Order by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #204 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Brady)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #202 Motion for permanent injunction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 03/30/2018. (mdm)
March 30, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE Regarding Briefing by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #202 MOTION for Temporary Restraining OrderMOTION for Preliminary Injunction (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2018 Filing 202 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McKnight email)(SELLS, BRYAN)
March 26, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE Defendant's Status Report by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #198 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
March 26, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE Defendant's Supplemental Brief Regarding Remedial Proposals by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #184 Reply to Response to Motion, #196 Notice (Other), #198 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, #195 Order, #189 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, #183 Response to Motion, #180 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion, #174 Notice (Other), #179 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #177 Notice (Other), #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript - McBride, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript - Owen, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition Transcript - Bensen, #4 Exhibit D - Rec Center Precinct Map)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
March 26, 2018 Filing 199 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Remedial Proposals by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #189 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, #180 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion, #174 Notice (Other), #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Owen deposition excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bensen deposition excerpt)(SELLS, BRYAN)
March 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER denying without prejudice #190 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration is ORDERED to confer with Sumter Countys legislative delegation and inform that Court no later than Monday, March 26, 2018 whether the General Assembly is inclined to enact a remedial plan before adjourning sine die or, if not, a timeline for when it believes a remedial plan could be adopted. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/17/18 (jbk)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER directing Defendants to file a Response to Motion re: #190 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR no later than 3/23/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/16/2018. (bcl)
March 15, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE Joint Notice Setting Deadline for Supplemental Briefs by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER memorializing the telephone discovery conference in this matter on March 14, 2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/15/2018. (bcl)
March 14, 2018 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Telephone Conference held on 3/14/2018. Written Order to be entered memorializing discussions and the Court's instructions Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk)
March 13, 2018 Filing 194 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #191 MOTION to Expedite re #190 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - qualifying candidate information)(SELLS, BRYAN)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER : Sumter County is ORDERED to produce a copy of each recompiled election analysis performed by Benson since January 1, 2014, as soon as it is able, and not later than Tuesday, March 13, 2018, at 5:00 P.M. The Parties are ORDERED to not reproduce the analyses or distribute them to parties outside of this case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 03/09/2018. (cma)
March 9, 2018 Filing 192 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #191 MOTION to Expedite re #190 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
March 9, 2018 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Telephone Conference held on 3/9/2018. Written Order to be entered memorializing discussions and the Court's instructions. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk)
March 8, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTING Telephone Conference set for 3/9/2018 10:00 AM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. NOTE: Attorney Sells will be responsible for contacting the participants and setting up the conference. When everyone is connected, please telephone Chambers at 229.430.8553 and we will proceed with the conference.(jbk)
March 7, 2018 Filing 191 EMERGENCY MOTION to Expedite re #190 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
March 7, 2018 Filing 190 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #164 Motion ; granting #166 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part #178 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part #178 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/1/2018. (bcl)
February 28, 2018 Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Status Conference held on 2/28/2018. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #185 Motion to Quash. The Court would welcome Brady's expertise at the hearing should he voluntarily choose to attend, but the Court will not order that he interrupt any already scheduled appointments or plans with so little notice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 2/27/18 (jbk)
February 27, 2018 Filing 186 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #185 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (SELLS, BRYAN)
February 27, 2018 Filing 185 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by KATHERINE L MCKNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Proposed Order)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
February 27, 2018 Filing 184 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #178 MOTION to Strike #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a MotionMOTION for limited discovery (SELLS, BRYAN)
February 24, 2018 Filing 183 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #178 MOTION to Strike #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a MotionMOTION for limited discovery (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dr. Karen L. Owen, #2 Affidavit of Clark H. Bensen)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
February 23, 2018 Filing 182 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #179 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
February 23, 2018 Filing 181 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #179 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (SELLS, BRYAN)
February 14, 2018 Filing 180 REPLY in Opposition re #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Frederick G. McBride)(SELLS, BRYAN) Modified on 2/15/2018 (bcl).
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #178 MOTION to Strike #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a MotionMOTION for limited discovery : Status Conference set for 2/28/2018 02:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 2/9/2018. (bcl)
February 9, 2018 Filing 178 EMERGENCY MOTION to Strike #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion (, ), MOTION for limited discovery by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
February 8, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE Regarding Response to Plaintiff's Remedial Proposals by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #176 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email chain)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
February 5, 2018 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #174 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Karen L. Owen)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by TREVOR M STANLEY (nop)
January 22, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Remedial Proposals by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Frederick G. McBride, #2 Proposed Order Implementing Plaintiff's Remedial Proposal 1, #3 Proposed Order Implementing Plaintiff's Remedial Proposal 2)(SELLS, BRYAN)
January 22, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE Response by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #168 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objection Chart)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
January 12, 2018 Filing 172 Proposed Findings of Fact by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
January 12, 2018 Filing 171 TRIAL BRIEF by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR(SELLS, BRYAN)
January 12, 2018 Filing 170 TRIAL BRIEF by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
January 12, 2018 Filing 169 Proposed Findings of Fact by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (Attachments: #1 Appendix of tables)(SELLS, BRYAN)
January 12, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE of plaintiff's supplemental objections to defendant's exhibit 10 by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #154 Exhibit List,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - list of errors identified in DX 10)(SELLS, BRYAN)
January 11, 2018 Filing 167 REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #164 MOTION for judicial notice of census data (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
January 11, 2018 Filing 166 MOTION for judicial notice of voter registration data by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - active voters by race and gender as of January 1, 2018, #2 Proposed Order)(SELLS, BRYAN)
January 11, 2018 Filing 165 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #164 MOTION for judicial notice of census data (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - defendant's supplemental disclosures)(SELLS, BRYAN)
January 11, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #164 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION ); For future reference, document must include to include a description of exhibit(s). Do not refile.(bcl)
January 10, 2018 Filing 164 MOTION for judicial notice of census data by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by KATHERINE L MCKNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Census Data, #2 Proposed Order)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE) Modified on 1/11/2018 (bcl).
January 4, 2018 Filing 163 NOTICE Plaintiff's Rebuttal Argument by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (SELLS, BRYAN)
December 28, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE Defendant's Closing Argument by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
December 21, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE Plaintiff's Closing Argument by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (SELLS, BRYAN)
December 21, 2017 Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/14/2017, before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. Volume Number: 4 of 4. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (GRAY, SALLY)
December 21, 2017 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/13/2017, before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. Bench Trial Volume Number: 3 of 4. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (GRAY, SALLY)
December 21, 2017 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/12/2017, before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. Bench Trial Volume Number: 2 of 4. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (GRAY, SALLY) Modified on 12/22/2017 (bcl).
December 21, 2017 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/11/2017, before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. Bench Trial Volume Number: 1 of 4. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (GRAY, SALLY)
December 21, 2017 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/14/2014, before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter/Transcriber SALLY GRAY. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (slg)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER directing the Clerk to prohibit a nonparty's remote electronic access to the Plaintiff's trial exhibit 265. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/18/2017. (bcl)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER memorializing the post-trial briefing schedule. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/18/2017. (bcl)
December 14, 2017 Filing 154 Exhibit List by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re Bench Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Current and Past Election Results, #2 Exhibit 2 - Active Voters, #3 Exhibit 3 - Active Voters, #4 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Supplemental Expert Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report, #7 Exhibit 7 - Rebuttal Report, #8 Exhibit 8 - Supplemental Report, #9 Exhibit 9 - Rebuttal Report, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summary Exhibit for Defendant Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit 11 - Meeting Minutes, #12 Exhibit 12 - Americn Community Survey 12/7/2017)(bcl)
December 14, 2017 Filing 153 Exhibit List by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re Bench Trial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McBride Cirriuculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit 4 - Select Demographic Chart, #3 Exhibit 10 - Table 4, #4 Exhibit 11 - Table 5, #5 Exhibit 12 - Table 6, #6 Exhibit 13 - Table 7, #7 Exhibit 14 - Table 8, #8 Exhibit 15 - Rable 9, #9 Exhibit 16 - Table10, #10 Exhibit 17 - McBride Rebuttal Report, #11 Exhibit 18 - Map of Sumter County Voting Precincts, #12 Exhibit 19 - Map of Sumter County BOE Districts, #13 Exhibit 20 - Map of Sumter COunty BOE Districts (Old), #14 Exhibit 21 - Select Sumter County Election Returns, #15 Exhibit 22a - 2010 Voter History File, #16 Exhibit 22b - 2014-03-18 Voter History File, #17 Exhibit 22c - 2014-05-20 Voter History File, #18 Exhibit 22d - 2014-07-22 Voter History File, #19 Exhibit 23 - 2001-11-04 Sumter County Turnout by Race, #20 Exhibit 24 - 2006-05-24 Sumter County Turnout by Race, # 21 Exhibit 25 - WITHDRAWN, #22 Exhibit 26 - House Bill 836, #23 Exhibit 28 - Section 5 Submission FIle No. 2011-4261, #24 Exhibit 29 - Section 5 Submission File No. 2011-3249, #25 Exhibit 30 - Section 5 Submission FIle No. 2010-2954, #26 Exhibit 31a - 2002 -11- 05 SOVC, #27 Exhibit 31b - 2002-11-26 Certified Returns, #28 Exhibit 31c - 2004-11-02 CErtified Returns, #29 Exhibit 31d - 2004-11-02 Precinct Returns, #30 Exhibit 31e - 2004-11-02 SOVC, #31 Exhibit 31f - 2006-11-07 SOVC, #32 Exhibit 31g - 2008-11-05 SOVC, #33 Exhibit 31h - 2010-11-02 SOVC, #34 Exhibit 31i - 2014-03-18 SOVC, #35 Exhibit 31j - 2014-05-20 Detail, #36 Exhibit 31k - 2014-07-22 Detail, #37 Exhibit 31l - 2016-05-24 Detail, #38 Exhibit 32a - 1996-11-05 Turnout, #39 Exhibit 32b - 1996-11-05 Turnout, #40 Exhibit 32c - 1998-11-03 Turnout, #41 Exhibit 32d - 2000-11-07 Turnout, #42 Exhibit 32e - 2002-11-05 Turnout, #43 Exhibit 32f - 2002-11-05 Turnout, #44 Exhibit 32g - 2004-11-02 Turnout, #45 Exhibit 32h - 2004-11-02 Turnout, #46 Exhibit 32i - 2006-11-07 Turnout, #47 Exhibit 32j - 2006-11-07 Turnout, #48 Exhibit 32k - 2008-11-04 Turnout, #49 Exhibit 32l - 2008-11-04 Turnout, #50 Exhibit 32m - 2010-11-02 Turnout, #51 Exhibit 32n - 2010-11-02 Turnout, #52 Exhibit 32o - 2014-05-20 Turnout, #53 Exhibit 32p - 2014-05-20 Turnout, #54 Exhibit 32q - 2014-07-22 Turnout, #55 Exhibit 32r - 2014-07-22 Turnout, #56 Exhibit 32s - 2016-05-24 Turnout, #57 Exhibit 32t - 2016-05-24 Turnout, #58 Exhibit 32u - 2016-05-24 Turnout, #59 Exhibit 32v - 2016-05-24 Turnout, #60 Exhibit 33 - Summary of Turnout Data, #61 Exhibit 34 - Summary of Election Data, #62 Exhibit 243 - Letter, #63 Exhibit 244 - Letter, #64 Exhibit 245 - Letter, #65 Exhibit 246 - Consent Order, #66 Exhibit 247 - Supplemental Order, #67 Exhibit 248 - Letter, #68 Exhibit 249 - Amended Final Judgment, #69 Exhibit 250 - Second Amended Judgment, #70 Exhibit 251 - Newspaper Article, #71 Exhibit 252 - Newspaper Article, #72 Exhibit 254 - Minute Sheet, #73 Exhibit 255 - Letter, #74 Exhibit 256 - Letter, #75 Exhibit 257 - Newspaper Article, #76 Exhibit 258 - Newspaper Article, #77 Exhibit 259 - Newspaper Article, #78 Exhibit 260 - Report, #79 Exhibit 265 - Voter File, #80 Exhibit 266 - 1968 Georgia Laws p. 2056, #81 Exhibit 267 - 1973 Georgia Laws p. 2127, #82 Exhibit 268 - 1992 Georgia Laws p. 5171, #83 Exhibit 269 - 1994 Georgia Laws p. 5108, #84 Exhibit 270 - 2002 Georgia Laws p. 3977, #85 Exhibit 271 - 2011 Georgia Laws p. 4020, #86 Exhibit 272 - 2011 Georgia Laws Exteaordinary Session p. 280)(bcl) Modified on 12/19/2017 (bcl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2018: #87 Exhibit 6 - McBride Supplemental Report) (bcl).
December 14, 2017 Filing 151 Witness List by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. re Bench Trial.(bcl)
December 14, 2017 Filing 150 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying 149 Motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/14/2017 (bcl)
December 14, 2017 Filing 149 ORAL MOTION to Exclude Dr. Owens' Opinions as not Identifed in Report by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(bcl)
December 14, 2017 Filing 148 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Bench Trial Day 4 held on 12/14/2017. Trial concluded. Court Reporter: Sally Gray.Time in Court: 5 hrs. (bcl)
December 13, 2017 Filing 155 STIPULATION (marked as Joint Exhibit 1) by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (bcl) Modified on 12/19/2017 (bcl).
December 13, 2017 Filing 146 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Bench Trial Day 3 held on 12/13/2017. Court Reporter: Sally Gray.Time in Court: 6 hrs 43 mins. (bcl)
December 12, 2017 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Bench Trial Day 2 held on 12/12/2017. Court Reporter: Sally Gray.Time in Court: 6 hrs 43 mins. (bcl)
December 11, 2017 Filing 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Bench Trial Day 1 held on 12/11/2017. Court Reporter: Sally Gray.Time in Court: 7 hrs. 12 mins.. (bcl)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER rescheduling the motions hearing for 12/11/2017 @ 8:00 am. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/08/2017. (bcl)
December 7, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE re Amended Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits and Procedure for Implementing any Remedy by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #141 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Objections)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
December 7, 2017 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The Pretrial Conference scheduled for 12/8/2017 is CANCELLED. Counsel are instructed to be present on Monday, 12/11/2017 at 8:00 a.m. to confer with the Court prior to start of trial at 8:30 a.m. (jbk)
December 7, 2017 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2017 02:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. (jbk)
December 6, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE re Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits and Procedure for Implementing any Remedy by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits)(MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
December 6, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE regarding remedial procedure by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (SELLS, BRYAN)
December 6, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE plaintiff's objections to defendant's exhibits by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #134 Order (SELLS, BRYAN)
November 29, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE Regarding Daubert Briefing by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #134 Order (MCKNIGHT, KATHERINE)
November 29, 2017 Filing 137 NOTICE regarding Daubert briefing by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #134 Order (SELLS, BRYAN)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RICHARD B RAILE (nop)
November 21, 2017 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/15/2017, before Judge W. LOUIS SANDS. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (GRAY, SALLY)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re #132 Pretrial Conference. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/20/2017. (bcl)
November 20, 2017 Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers (bcl)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JOHN J PARK, JR; FRANK B STRICKLAND; Barclay S Hendrix and ANNE WARE LEWIS terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/15/2017. (bcl)
November 15, 2017 Filing 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Pretrial Conference held on 11/15/2017. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by E MARK BRADEN , KATHERINE L. MCKNIGHT (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission) (nop) Modified on 11/16/2017 (bcl).
November 14, 2017 Filing 130 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Hendrix, Barclay)
November 13, 2017 Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers (bcl)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #127 Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference and Trial. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/9/2017. (bcl)
November 8, 2017 Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers (bcl)
November 8, 2017 Filing 128 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #127 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference andTrial (SELLS, BRYAN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference andTrial by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Hendrix, Barclay)
November 7, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AKLIMA KHONDOKER on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney AKLIMA KHONDOKER added to party MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KHONDOKER, AKLIMA)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying #88 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #89 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #106 Motion in Limine; granting #110 Motion for Judicial Notice of Census Data. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/26/2017. (bcl)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of Time to for Responses to Deposition Designations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/18/2017 (bcl)
October 16, 2017 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 Notice (Other) (SELLS, BRYAN)
October 16, 2017 Filing 122 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #120 Notice (Other) by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SELLS, BRYAN)
October 6, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by FRANK B STRICKLAND on behalf of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION Attorney FRANK B STRICKLAND added to party SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft) (STRICKLAND, FRANK)
October 5, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE Filing Designation of Deposition Testimony by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Hendrix, Barclay)
October 5, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE of filing of deposition designations by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (SELLS, BRYAN)
October 5, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOHN J PARK, JR on behalf of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION Attorney JOHN J PARK, JR added to party SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft) (PARK, JOHN)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Extension of Time for Designation of Deposition Testimony. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 9/28/2017. (bcl)
September 27, 2017 Filing 116 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Designation of Deposition Testimony. by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion)(Hendrix, Barclay)
September 27, 2017 Filing 115 Notice of Leave of Absence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Letter from Doctor)(LEWIS, ANNE)
September 21, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SETTING Pretrial Conference for 11/15/2017 02:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER FORM - Non Jury Case)(jbk)
July 26, 2017 Filing 113 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #110 MOTION for judicial notice of census data (Hendrix, Barclay)
July 19, 2017 Filing 112 REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #106 MOTION in Limine regarding Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony (Hendrix, Barclay)
July 13, 2017 Filing 111 STATUS REPORT by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Hendrix, Barclay)
July 5, 2017 Filing 110 MOTION for judicial notice of census data by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - selected census data)(SELLS, BRYAN)
July 5, 2017 Filing 109 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #105 MOTION in Limine regarding Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony, #106 MOTION in Limine regarding Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony (SELLS, BRYAN)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying #107 Motion for a Telephonic Status Conference. The Parties are ORDERED to confer and submit a joint status report not later than Friday, July 14, 2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 06/23/2017. (mdm)
June 20, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION for a telephonic status conference by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS.(SELLS, BRYAN)
June 14, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION in Limine regarding Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony)(Hendrix, Barclay)
June 14, 2017 Filing 105 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION in Limine regarding Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix.(Hendrix, Barclay) Modified on 6/15/2017 (mdm).
June 5, 2017 Filing 104 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #88 MOTION in Limine regarding the testimony of Dr. Karen L. Owen (SELLS, BRYAN)
June 5, 2017 Filing 103 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment (SELLS, BRYAN)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying #98 Motion to Strike. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 05/31/2017. (mdm)
May 26, 2017 Filing 101 REPLY to Response filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #98 MOTION to Strike #97 MOTION in Limine regarding Motion to Renew Motion to Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony (SELLS, BRYAN)
May 22, 2017 Filing 100 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #98 MOTION to Strike #97 MOTION in Limine regarding Motion to Renew Motion to Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony (Hendrix, Barclay)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER directing the Defendant to respond to #98 MOTION to Strike #97 MOTION in Limine regarding Motion to Renew Motion to Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Daubert motion #97 is hereby stayed. Plaintiff's replies to Motions #88 and #89 are also stayed. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/8/2017. (bcl)
May 5, 2017 Filing 98 EMERGENCY MOTION to Strike #97 MOTION in Limine regarding Motion to Renew Motion to Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(SELLS, BRYAN)
May 1, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION in Limine regarding Motion to Renew Motion to Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix.(Hendrix, Barclay)
May 1, 2017 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #94 Notice (Other) filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION ); Other - Document must be re-filed as a motion. (bcl)
April 28, 2017 Filing 96 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #88 MOTION in Limine regarding the testimony of Dr. Karen L. Owen (Hendrix, Barclay)
April 28, 2017 Filing 95 RESPONSE filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is Genuine Issue to Be Tried)(Hendrix, Barclay)
April 28, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE Defendant's Renewed Motion to Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Hendrix, Barclay)
April 28, 2017 Filing 93 DEPOSITION of Robert Brady taken on February 14, 2017 filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Related document: #90 Certificate of Need to File Discovery, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2, Report, #3 Exhibit 3, Candidate Qualification, #4 Exhibit 4, Pages from McBride Report, #5 Exhibit 5, Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Interrogatories)(Hendrix, Barclay)
April 28, 2017 Filing 92 DEPOSITION of Karen L. Owen taken on March 20, 2017 filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Related document: #90 Certificate of Need to File Discovery, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR, #88 MOTION in Limine regarding the testimony of Dr. Karen L. Owen filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Owen Resume, #2 Exhibit 2, CRJ310 Syllabus, #3 Exhibit 3, Southern Politics Syllabus, #4 Exhibit 4, Article, #5 Exhibit 5, Owen Declaration-Fayette County, #6 Exhibit 6, EI Output, #7 Exhibit 7, McBride Corrected Supplemental Report, #8 Exhibit 8, Owen Supplemental Report)(Hendrix, Barclay)
April 28, 2017 Filing 91 DEPOSITION of Frederick G. McBride taken on March 16, 2017 filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Related document: #90 Certificate of Need to File Discovery, filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR, #88 MOTION in Limine regarding the testimony of Dr. Karen L. Owen filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, EI Output, #2 Exhibit 2, McBride Corrected Supplemental Report, #3 Exhibit 3, McBride Supplemental Report, #4 Exhibit 4, Maptitude Population Data, #5 Exhibit 5, McBride Rebuttal to Owen Supplemental Report)(Hendrix, Barclay)
April 28, 2017 Filing 90 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Related document: #89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR, #88 MOTION in Limine regarding the testimony of Dr. Karen L. Owen filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR.(Hendrix, Barclay)
April 7, 2017 Filing 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit A - McBride Report, #4 Exhibit B - McBride Rebuttal)(SELLS, BRYAN)
April 7, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION in Limine regarding the testimony of Dr. Karen L. Owen by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Owen report, #3 Exhibit Owen deposition excerpt)(SELLS, BRYAN)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be complete by 3/27/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 2/22/2017 (bcl)
February 17, 2017 Filing 86 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Discovery)(Hendrix, Barclay)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Discovery to be complete by 2/24/2017. Dispositive motions due by 4/7/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/20/2016 (bcl)
December 16, 2016 Filing 84 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendrix, Barclay)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/1/2016. (bcl)
October 26, 2016 Filing 82 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File expert disclosures. by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by Barclay S Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendrix, Barclay)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 9/20/2016. (bcl)
September 16, 2016 Filing 80 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File expert disclosures. by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by BRYAN L SELLS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SELLS, BRYAN)
August 26, 2016 Filing 79 MANDATE of USCA as to #64 Notice of Appeal filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (ans)
August 18, 2016 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 12/26/2016. Dispositive motions due by 2/6/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/17/2016. (bcl)
August 17, 2016 Notice of Deficiency; Other - Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Orders should not be e-filed. They should be emailed to the division address where the case was filed, per the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(related document(s): #77 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION ). (bcl)
August 16, 2016 Filing 77 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #76 Order (LEWIS, ANNE)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER directing the Parties to submit a joint proposed discovery and scheduling order no later than 8/16/2016. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/9/2016. (bcl)
August 8, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRYAN L SELLS on behalf of MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR Attorney BRYAN L SELLS added to party MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR(pty:pla) (SELLS, BRYAN)
August 8, 2016 Filing 74 Parties Joint REPORT filed by BARCLAY S HENDRIX (HENDRIX, BARCLAY) Modified on 8/9/2016 (bcl).
August 5, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BARCLAY S HENDRIX on behalf of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION Attorney BARCLAY S HENDRIX added to party SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft) (HENDRIX, BARCLAY)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER directing the Parties to confer and submit a joint report no later than 8/9/2016. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/1/2016. (bcl)
July 28, 2016 Filing 71 USCA Order as to #64 Notice of Appeal filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (mdm)
October 16, 2015 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #64 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (bcl)
September 25, 2015 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***
September 16, 2015 Filing 70 REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, Response to #66 Bill of Costs filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (LEWIS, ANNE)
September 2, 2015 Filing 69 Response to #66 Bill of Costs filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wright Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Old Person v. Brown Order)(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
August 17, 2015 Filing 68 USCA Case Number 15-13628-D re #64 Notice of Appeal filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (bcl)
August 14, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; For future reference, documents must be filed in text-searchable PDF format; documents must include a description of exhibit(s) (related document(s): #66 Bill of Costs filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION ). DO NOT REFILE. (bcl)
August 13, 2015 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Support of #66 Bill of Costs (LEWIS, ANNE)
August 13, 2015 Filing 66 BILL OF COSTS by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LEWIS, ANNE)
August 12, 2015 Filing 65 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #62 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, #63 Judgment, #64 Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: W. Louis Sands. Court Reporter: Darlene Pino. Fee Paid: Paid. (bcl)
August 12, 2015 Appeal Instructions re #64 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 8/31/2015 (bcl)
August 11, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #63 Judgment by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. Filing fee $ 505, Receipt No.: 113G-2143609. (MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
July 14, 2015 Filing 63 JUDGMENT in favor of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION against MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (bcl)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #41 Motion for Hearing; finding as moot #42 Motion to Exclude. The Clerk is dorected to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/14/2015 (bcl)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Strike ; terminating #48 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/14/2015 (bcl)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/1/15 (wks)
April 30, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(NESMITH, WILLIAM)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney CHARA FISHER JACKSON terminated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 4/22/2015. (bcl)
April 21, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by CHARA FISHER JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Withdrawal Order)(JACKSON, CHARA)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney BRYAN P TYSON terminated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 4/2/2015. (bcl)
April 2, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly A. Reid on behalf of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (wks)
April 1, 2015 Filing 54 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by BRYAN P TYSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TYSON, BRYAN)
March 26, 2015 Filing 53 REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #48 MOTION to Strike #47 MOTION for Summary JudgmentMOTION to Stay Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion (LEWIS, ANNE)
March 26, 2015 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #50 Response to Motion, #51 Response to Motion (MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
March 26, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; Certificate of Service not attached; please file a Certificate of Service in conncection with these documents - (related document(s): #50 Response to Motion filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR, #51 Response to Motion filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR ). (bcl)
March 25, 2015 Filing 51 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NUMBERED MATERIAL FACTS AND STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS TO WHICH THERE EXISTS A GENUINE DISPUTE TO BE TRIED filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #49 Order (MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN) Modified on 3/26/2015 (bcl).
March 25, 2015 Filing 50 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #48 MOTION to Strike #47 MOTION for Summary JudgmentMOTION to Stay Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion (MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER for Response to Motion re: #48 MOTION to Strike #47 MOTION for Summary JudgmentMOTION to Stay Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (). The Court also stays Defendant's time to respond to Wright's Motion for Summary Judgment pending resolution of the Motion to Strike. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 3/20/15. (wks)
March 18, 2015 Filing 48 MOTION to Strike #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION to Stay Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by ANNE WARE LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LEWIS, ANNE)
March 13, 2015 Filing 47 ***STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PER #61 ORDER*** MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by LAUGHLIN MCDONALD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Dispute to Be Tried)(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN) Modified on 7/14/2015 (bcl).
February 17, 2015 Filing 46 REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment (LEWIS, ANNE)
February 13, 2015 Filing 45 REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re #42 MOTION Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony (LEWIS, ANNE)
February 3, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; Document exceeds page limit, leave of court required before filing - ***DO NOT REFILE*** (related document(s): #44 Response to Motion,,,, filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR ). (bcl)
February 2, 2015 Filing 44 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sumter County District Demographics, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Pottinger to Crisp, 7/13/1973, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter from Reynolds to Crisp, 12/17/1982, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Reynolds to Crisp, 9/6/1983, #5 Exhibit 5 - Edge v. Sumter Cnty. Sch. Dist. Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Edge v. Sumter Cnty. Sch. Dist. Supplemental Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter from Skipper to Herren, 1/19/2012, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wilkerson v. Ferguson Amended Final Judgment, #9 Exhibit 9 - Wilkerson v. Ferguson Second Amended Judgment, #10 Exhibit 10 - Americus Adds a Wrinkle, #11 Exhibit 11 - Americus Stifles Negro Drive, #12 Exhibit 12 - Harris v. Chappell, #13 Exhibit 13 - Election Law Study Committee Minutes, #14 Exhibit 14 - Letter from Horne to Fortson, 10/18/1963, #15 Exhibit 15 - Letter from Crisp to Fortson, 11/12/1963, #16 Exhibit 16 - Americus Negroes Prepare for Siege, #17 Exhibit 17 - Negroes Reject Americus Panel, #18 Exhibit 18 - Racial Duress Studied by U.S., #19 Exhibit 19 - Desegregation of Public Schools in Georgia)(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
January 30, 2015 Filing 43 RESPONSE filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re #42 MOTION Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McBride Declaration)(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
January 12, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION Exclude Portion of Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by ANNE WARE LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Report of Frederick McBride)(LEWIS, ANNE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION for Hearing re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by ANNE WARE LEWIS.(LEWIS, ANNE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION filed by ANNE WARE LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Dispute to be Tried, #3 Exhibit A - Report of Frederick McBride, #4 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Karen L. Owen)(LEWIS, ANNE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 39 DEPOSITION of Karen Owen taken on November 20, 2014 filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Related document: #36 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Karen L. Owen)(LEWIS, ANNE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 38 DEPOSITION of Frederick Glenn McBride taken on November 14, 2014 filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Related document: #36 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report of Frederick McBride, #2 Exhibit 2 - Law Review: Extreme Makeover, #3 Exhibit 3 - Voter Registration as of August 2014, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summary Sheet of Analyzed Elections, #5 Exhibit 5 - Response to Defendants Expert Report of Karen L. Owen, #6 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report of Karen L. Owen, #7 Exhibit 7 - King Estimates Data Output)(LEWIS, ANNE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 37 DEPOSITION of Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. taken on November 13, 2014 filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. Related document: #36 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - AmericuSumter Observer on law firm, #3 Exhibit 3 - AmericuSumter Observer on county attorney, #4 Exhibit 4 - AmericuSumter Observer on republican law firm, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from AdvancED, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Responses to First Interrogatories)(LEWIS, ANNE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 36 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION.(LEWIS, ANNE)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 11/4/2014. (bcl)
October 30, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by LAUGHLIN MCDONALD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney CHAD M BROCK terminated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 10/16/2014. (bcl)
October 14, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE Plaintiff's First Request for Judicial Notice by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1973 DOJ Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1982 DOJ Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1983 DOJ Letter)(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
October 10, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by CHAD M BROCK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROCK, CHAD)
October 10, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHARA FISHER JACKSON on behalf of MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR Attorney CHARA FISHER JACKSON added to party MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JACKSON, CHARA)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 9/18/2014. (bcl)
September 12, 2014 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (BROCK, CHAD)
September 12, 2014 Notice of Deficiency; Certificate of Service not attached - (related document(s): #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR ). (bcl)
September 11, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR filed by LAUGHLIN MCDONALD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time for Discovery)(MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
August 7, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRYAN P TYSON on behalf of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION Attorney BRYAN P TYSON added to party SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft) (TYSON, BRYAN)
August 7, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ANNE WARE LEWIS on behalf of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION Attorney ANNE WARE LEWIS added to party SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft) (LEWIS, ANNE)
August 1, 2014 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #23 Notice of Attorney Appearance, (BROCK, CHAD)
July 31, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHAD M BROCK on behalf of MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR Attorney CHAD M BROCK added to party MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR(pty:pla) (BROCK, CHAD) Modified on 8/1/2014 (bcl).***EMAILED ATTORNEY BROCK AND ADVISED THAT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS MISSING***
July 30, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LAUGHLIN MCDONALD on behalf of MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR Attorney LAUGHLIN MCDONALD added to party MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR(pty:pla) (MCDONALD, LAUGHLIN)
July 2, 2014 Filing 21 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Jury Trial tentatively set for 4/6/2015 08:30 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 7/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(bcl)
June 25, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS: Discovery Hearing held on 6/25/2014. Discovery and Scheduling Order to be entered. [Note: Atty Nesmith was not present.] (Court Reporter: Darlene Pino.) (jbk)
June 17, 2014 Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers (bcl)
June 3, 2014 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text Order - Rules 16/26: Mailed to Plaintiff at address listed on the docket (jbk)
June 3, 2014 This is a text only entry; no document issued.RULES 16/26 ORDER: Scheduling Conference RESET for 6/25/2014 03:30 PM in Albany before U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 6/3/14. [The parties are directed to submit a Proposed Rules 16/26 Scheduling Order consistent with the Courts previous order dated 4/21/2014.](jbk)
April 30, 2014 Filing 20 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendant (NESMITH, WILLIAM)
April 28, 2014 Filing 19 Arbitration Referral Letter sent 4/28/2014 (hrm)
April 21, 2014 Filing 18 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2014 03:30 PM in Albany before U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 4/21/14. (jbk)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 1). Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 4/3/14. (wks)
March 28, 2014 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION.(NESMITH, WILLIAM)
March 26, 2014 Filing 15 Letter regarding Update on election deadline dates (NESMITH, WILLIAM)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to March 18, 2014 election. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 3/17/2014. (mpw)
March 14, 2014 Filing 13 MASTER Exhibit List by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re Injunction Hearing held on 3/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Report of Special Review, #3 Exhibit 3 - Monitoring Review Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Monitoring Visit Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter)(bcl)
March 14, 2014 Filing 12 MASTER Witness List by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR re Injunction Hearing held on 3/14/2014.(bcl) Modified on 3/17/2014 (bcl).
March 14, 2014 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/14/2014. (Court Reporter: Darlene Pino.) (jbk) Modified on 3/17/2014 (bcl).
March 13, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of the Issuance of Subopenas re #8 Notice of Hearing - Injunction Hearing set for 3/14/14 @ 11 am before Judge W. Louis Sands. (bcl)
March 11, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III on behalf of SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION Attorney WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III added to party SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft) (NESMITH, WILLIAM)
March 11, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of RESETTING Hearing: INJUNCTION Hearing RESET for 3/14/2014 11:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS. (jbk)
March 10, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of INJUNCTION Hearing set for 3/13/2014 04:00 PM in Albany before U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS. (jbk)
March 7, 2014 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Donnie Smith) on 3/7/2014. (bcl)
March 7, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Edith A. Green) on 3/7/2014. (bcl)
March 7, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Robert Brady) on 3/7/2014. (bcl)
March 7, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Michael Tracy) on 3/7/2014. (bcl)
March 7, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION (Attorney William NeSmith) on 3/7/2014. (bcl)
March 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 40723, filed by MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR. (bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: BERNARD GROFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR
Represented By: LAUGHLIN MCDONALD
Represented By: CHAD M BROCK
Represented By: DALE E HO
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: AKLIMA KHONDOKER
Represented By: CHARA FISHER JACKSON
Represented By: BRYAN L SELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION
Represented By: E MARK BRADEN
Represented By: KATHERINE L MCKNIGHT
Represented By: BARCLAY VALLOTTON
Represented By: TREVOR M STANLEY
Represented By: FRANK B STRICKLAND
Represented By: BRYAN P TYSON
Represented By: JOHN J PARK, JR
Represented By: ANNE WARE LEWIS
Represented By: KIMBERLY A REID
Represented By: WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III
Represented By: RICHARD B RAILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?