NARAMORE v. DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Plaintiff: MIRIAM NARAMORE
Defendant: DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00156
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Albany Office
County: Dougherty
Presiding Judge: LESLIE J ABRAMS
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KENDALL C DUNSON on behalf of MIRIAM NARAMORE Attorney KENDALL C DUNSON added to party MIRIAM NARAMORE(pty:pla) (DUNSON, KENDALL)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by H LANIER BROWN, II, DAVID L BROWN, JR (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission) (nop)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/19/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL H LANIER BROWN, II, DAVID L BROWN, JR - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (bcl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 Jurisdictional Statement by DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC (MIDDLETON, F)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC identifying Corporate Parent DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent DAIMLER AG for DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC. (MIDDLETON, F)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Jury Demand.(MIDDLETON, F)Attorney F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV added to party DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC(pty:dft)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 9/4/2018. (bcl)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MIRIAM NARAMORE as to DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC. (BAKER, BENJAMIN)
August 20, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Complaint (IFP) filed by MIRIAM NARAMORE, #4 Motion for Protective Order, filed by MIRIAM NARAMORE ); Other - There is a discrepancy regarding the spelling of Daimler on the Complaint and in ECF. Do not refile. (bcl)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC. (bcl)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by J GREG ALLEN (nop)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order by MIRIAM NARAMORE filed by BENJAMIN E BAKER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law Supporting her Motion for Protective Order and or Preservation of Evidence, #2 Exhibit A - Accident Report, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and for Permanent Injunction, #4 Exhibit C - Order dated June 18, 2018)(BAKER, BENJAMIN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (IFP) against MIRIAM NARAMORE filed by MIRIAM NARAMORE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(BAKER, BENJAMIN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MIRIAM NARAMORE (bcl)
August 17, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by MIRIAM NARAMORE ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Summons were filed as one document. When opening a new case, the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons should be filed as attachments to the complaint. Please refile the Complaint using the Complaint/IFP event and attach the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. (bcl)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miriam Naramore Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2950449, $400 filed by Miriam Naramore (BAKER, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NARAMORE v. DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM NARAMORE
Represented By: J GREG ALLEN
Represented By: BENJAMIN E BAKER
Represented By: KENDALL C DUNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: DAVID L BROWN, JR
Represented By: F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV
Represented By: H LANIER BROWN, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?