NEWBERRY v. OWENS et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY NEWBERRY
Defendant: SGT OWENS, SGT CLYDE, DO OFFICER JENKINS, SGT GILBERT, DO WADE and DO OFFICER LENORD
Case Number: 1:2018cv00166
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE J ABRAMS
Referring Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directed to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 10/18/2018. (TQL)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned - #5 Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to Anthony Newberry returned as undeliverable. (bcl)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Plaintiff to Recast Complaint, and granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 9/5/2018. (TQL)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ANTHONY NEWBERRY. (bcl)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by ANTHONY NEWBERRY. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANTHONY NEWBERRY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEWBERRY v. OWENS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT CLYDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO OFFICER JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO OFFICER LENORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY NEWBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?