MOYE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: BRUCE LIONAL MOYE
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Yet Classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Referring Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. All parties having consented pursuant to 28 USC 636(c)(1) for a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct any and all proceedings in connection with this action, including but not limited to, the trial of said case and the ordering of the entry of judgment herein; this case is hereby reassigned to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF for all further proceedings. (mdm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (OSTERHOUT, KARL)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KARL E OSTERHOUT (nop)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney & Attorney General.(mdm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bcl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney & Attorney General. (bcl)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 5/8/2019. (bmb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRUCE LIONAL MOYE filed by EDWARD BURTON CLAXTON, III.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(CLAXTON, EDWARD)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER giving Plaintiff twenty-one (21) days to file an affidavit in support of his #2 Motion to proceed IFP with a corrected date. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 4/25/2019. (bmb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BRUCE LIONAL MOYE (mdm)
April 25, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 MOTION Petition For Admission To Plead And Practice PRO HAC VICE filed by BRUCE LIONAL MOYE ); Other: Petitions to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice are not filed as Motions in this Court. For instructions on how to be admitted pro hac vice, please visit the For Attorneys/Attorney Admissions section on our website at www.gamd.uscourts.gov. (mdm)
April 25, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by BRUCE LIONAL MOYE, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by BRUCE LIONAL MOYE ); Documents do NOT have to be refiled, but all future filings must be converted into a text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. (mdm)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Petition For Admission To Plead And Practice PRO HAC VICE by BRUCE LIONAL MOYE filed by EDWARD BURTON CLAXTON, III.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(CLAXTON, EDWARD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRUCE LIONAL MOYE filed by EDWARD BURTON CLAXTON, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 USM 285 USM-285 Process Receipt and Return). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(CLAXTON, EDWARD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by BRUCE LIONAL MOYE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(CLAXTON, EDWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOYE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE LIONAL MOYE
Represented By: KARL E OSTERHOUT
Represented By: EDWARD BURTON CLAXTON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?