PATEL v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Sharadchandra Patel and SHARADCHANDRA PATEL
Defendant: Dir USCIS CA Srv Ctr KATHY BARAN, Assoc Dir USCIS DONALD NEUFELD, Acting US Sec DHS KEVIN K MCALEENAN, Dist Dir USCIS ATL DENISE FRAZIER, Field Ofc Dir KEVIN RIDDLE, Director of USCIS Lee Francis cissna, Dir USCIS TX Srv Ctr Gregory A Richardson, U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR, DENISE FRAZIER, L FRANCIS CISSNA, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, KATHY BARAN, WILLIAM BARR, DONALD NEUFELD, KEVIN RIDDLE and GREGORY A RICHARDSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00075
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 07/11/2019 (mdm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KATHY BARAN, WILLIAM BARR, L FRANCIS CISSNA, DENISE FRAZIER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, DONALD NEUFELD, GREGORY A RICHARDSON, KEVIN RIDDLE filed by AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS MAILED to KEVIN RIDDLE. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS MAILED to DENISE FRAZIER. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS MAILED to GREGORY A RICHARDSON. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS MAILED to KATHY BARAN. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS MAILED to DONALD NEUFELD. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS MAILED to L FRANCIS CISSNA. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS MAILED to KEVIN K MCALEENAN. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS MAILED to WILLIAM BARR. (ECHOLS, ELI) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct docket text. (mdm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KATHY BARAN, WILLIAM BARR, L FRANCIS CISSNA, DENISE FRAZIER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, DONALD NEUFELD, GREGORY A RICHARDSON, KEVIN RIDDLE. (Attachments: #1 Summons McAleenan, #2 Summons Cissna, #3 Summons Neufeld, #4 Summons Richardson, #5 Summons Baran, #6 Summons Frazier, #7 Summons Riddle)(mdm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3159927, $400 filed by Sharadchandra Patel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, case status printout for Plaintiff's Form I-526, #2 Exhibit Ex B, copies of green cards of Plaintiff and family members, #3 Exhibit Ex C, Plaintiff's Form I-829 with receipt, #4 Exhibit Ex D, docs related to Plaintiff's operation of the Windsor Hotel, #5 Exhibit Ex E, USCIS "Check Case Processing Times" print out as of 5/1/2019, #6 Exhibit Ex F, USCIS "Historical National Average Processing Times for All USCIS Offices" printed 5/1/2019, #7 Exhibit Ex G, correspondence related to Form I-829 Status Inquiries, #8 Exhibit Ex H, docs related to visa filing by Plaintiff's son on Plaintiff's behalf, #9 Exhibit Ex I, case status printout for Plaintiff's Form I-829, #10 Summons Summons for ATTY GEN William Barr, #11 Summons Summons for ACTING DHS SEC Kevin McAleenan, #12 Summons Summons for USCIS DIR L Francis Cissna, #13 Summons Summons for USCIS ASSOC DIR Donald Neufeld, #14 Summons Summons for USCIS TX SRV CTR DIR Gregory Richardson, #15 Summons Summons for USCIS CA SRV CTR DIR Kathy Baran, #16 Summons Summons for USCIS DIST DIR Denise Frazier, #17 Summons Summons for USCIS FLD OFC DIR Kevin Riddle, #18 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(ECHOLS, ELI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATEL v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir USCIS CA Srv Ctr KATHY BARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assoc Dir USCIS DONALD NEUFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting US Sec DHS KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dist Dir USCIS ATL DENISE FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Ofc Dir KEVIN RIDDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of USCIS Lee Francis cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir USCIS TX Srv Ctr Gregory A Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE FRAZIER
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY BARAN
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD NEUFELD
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN RIDDLE
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY A RICHARDSON
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Sharadchandra Patel
Represented By: ELI A ECHOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARADCHANDRA PATEL
Represented By: ELI A ECHOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?