ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC v. FLETCHER et al
Plaintiff: ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC
Defendant: ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER, CHARLES W CLARK and ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00158
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 11/18/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER, ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER with Jury Demand.(KIRBO, JOHN)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR - FILED CORRECTLY AT #16 *** ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER, ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER. Related document: #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by CHARLES W CLARK.(KIRBO, JOHN) Modified on 10/17/2019 (mdm).
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR - FILED CORRECTLY AT #16 *** ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER, ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER. Related document: #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by CHARLES W CLARK.(KIRBO, JOHN)Attorney JOHN HALL KIRBO added to party ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER(pty:crd), Attorney JOHN HALL KIRBO added to party ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER(pty:dft), Attorney JOHN HALL KIRBO added to party ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER(pty:crd), Attorney JOHN HALL KIRBO added to party ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER(pty:dft) Modified on 10/17/2019 (mdm).
October 17, 2019 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER, ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (bcl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER, ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff's Counsel in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Military Status Reports)(WOLFSON, DAVID)
October 15, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Motion for Entry of Default, filed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC ); Document must be re-filed using correct event - Application to Clerk's for Entry of Default. (bcl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Robert Bridges Fletcher and Angela Marie Fletcher by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC filed by DAVID M WOLFSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff's Counsel in Support of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Military Status Reports)(WOLFSON, DAVID)
October 15, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Motion for Entry of Default filed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). (bcl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Robert Bridges Fletcher and Angela Marie Fletcher by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC filed by DAVID M WOLFSON.(WOLFSON, DAVID)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint(), CROSSCLAIM against ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER, ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER by CHARLES W CLARK.(EDGE, JAMES)Attorney JAMES H EDGE added to party CHARLES W CLARK(pty:dft)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC as to ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER. (WOLFSON, DAVID)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC as to ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER. (WOLFSON, DAVID)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC as to CHARLES W CLARK. (WOLFSON, DAVID)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC as to Charles Clark. (WOLFSON, DAVID) Modified on 9/17/2019 to update text (bcl).
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC (WOLFSON, DAVID)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC (WOLFSON, DAVID)
September 11, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (mdm)
September 11, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (mdm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC. (bcl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CHARLES W CLARK, ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER, ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bcl)
September 10, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. Additionally, for future reference, all documents must be filed to include a description of exhibit(s). Do not refile. (bcl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARM Funding 2018-1 LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3259519, $400 filed by ARM Funding 2018-1 LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons of Robert Fletcher, #3 Summons Summons of Angela Fletcher, #4 Summons Summons of Charles Clark, #5 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit - Letter)(WOLFSON, DAVID) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add text (bcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC v. FLETCHER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BRIDGES FLETCHER
Represented By: JOHN HALL KIRBO
Represented By: Glenn Arthur Kirbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES W CLARK
Represented By: RICKIE LEE BROWN, JR
Represented By: JAMES H EDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA MARIE FLETCHER
Represented By: JOHN HALL KIRBO
Represented By: Glenn Arthur Kirbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARM FUNDING 2018-1 LLC
Represented By: JACOB MONTANO
Represented By: DAVID M WOLFSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?