CAMPBELL et al v. WORKHORSE GROUP INC
Plaintiff: JENNIFER JOHNSON CAMPBELL and JESSICA TAGNEY
Defendant: WORKHORSE GROUP, INC., IMPROPERLY NAMED AS WORKHORSE TRUCKS, INC. (WORKHORSE GROUP, INC.) and WORKHORSE GROUP INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00209
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Submit Scheduling Order. Discovery is STAYED pending the resolution of #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 01/08/2020. (mdm)
January 7, 2020 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WORKHORSE GROUP INC (mdm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 Letter regarding Request Court for Extension for Reply Brief (BANICH, CATHERINE)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Submit Scheduling Order. by WORKHORSE GROUP INC filed by CATHERINE MYRA BANICH.(BANICH, CATHERINE)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by JENNIFER JOHNSON CAMPBELL filed by DYLAN J HOOPER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MOS of Plaintiff Motion for Leave to Amend, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(HOOPER, DYLAN)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON CAMPBELL re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UPS Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit UPS Registration, #3 Exhibit 2015 SEC Filing, #4 Exhibit 2015 SEC Certification 1, #5 Exhibit 2015 SEC Certification 2, #6 Exhibit 2018 SEC Filing, #7 Exhibit 2018 SEC Report 1, #8 Exhibit 2018 SEC Report 2, #9 Exhibit 2018 SEC Report 3, #10 Exhibit 2018 SEC Report 4, #11 Exhibit 2013 SEC Annual Report, #12 Exhibit Workhorse Website, #13 Exhibit UpTime Parts - Fleet, #14 Exhibit Navistar Registration, #15 Exhibit Ryder Contract, #16 Exhibit Ryder Registration)(HOOPER, DYLAN)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by DYLAN J HOOPER (nop)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WORKHORSE GROUP INC filed by BRYNDA RODRIGUEZ INSLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Willison, PhD in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(INSLEY, BRYNDA)
December 3, 2019 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL DYLAN J HOOPER - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (nop)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time Within Which Defendant has to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by WORKHORSE GROUP INC (INSLEY, BRYNDA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WORKHORSE GROUP INC identifying Other Affiliate WORKHORSE TECHNOLOGIES INC OHIO, Other Affiliate WORKHORSE MOTOR WORKS INC INDIANA, Other Affiliate WORKHORSE PROPERTIES INC OHIO, Other Affiliate SUREFLY INC DELAWARE for WORKHORSE GROUP INC. (INSLEY, BRYNDA)
November 20, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by WORKHORSE GROUP INC, #4 Jurisdictional Statement filed by WORKHORSE GROUP INC ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. Per page 8 of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, the name of the ECF user under whose login and password the document is submitted must be preceded by s/ in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. The s/ name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. DOCUMENTS MUST BE REFILED. (mdm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by WORKHORSE GROUP INC (INSLEY, BRYNDA)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WORKHORSE GROUP INC (INSLEY, BRYNDA)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WORKHORSE GROUP INC (bcl)
November 18, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL DYLAN J HOOPER - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (bcl)
November 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WORKHORSE GROUP INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (bcl)
November 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WORKHORSE GROUP INC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, please refer to page 18 of the Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing when entering an estate as a party. NO NEED TO REFILE. (bcl)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against JENNIFER JOHNSON CAMPBELL, JESSICA TAGNEY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3316884, $400 filed by WORKHORSE GROUP, INC., IMPROPERLY NAMED AS WORKHORSE TRUCKS, INC. (WORKHORSE GROUP, INC.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(INSLEY, BRYNDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL et al v. WORKHORSE GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORKHORSE GROUP, INC., IMPROPERLY NAMED AS WORKHORSE TRUCKS, INC. (WORKHORSE GROUP, INC.)
Represented By: BRYNDA RODRIGUEZ INSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORKHORSE GROUP INC
Represented By: BRYNDA RODRIGUEZ INSLEY
Represented By: CATHERINE MYRA BANICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER JOHNSON CAMPBELL
Represented By: DYLAN J HOOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA TAGNEY
Represented By: DYLAN J HOOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?