HARPE-MOSES v. EATON CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: TEMEKA HARPE-MOSES
Defendant: Cooper Lighting LLC and EATON CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00087
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Protective Order. Accordingly, the Parties proposed Stipulated Protective Order [12-1] is hereby ADOPTED and made the ORDER of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 08/21/2020. (mdm)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION filed by Emily S. Borna. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Borna, Emily)
July 16, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Stipulation filed by COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION ); A motion must be filed attaching a proposed Order.(mdm)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 1/12/2021. Dispositive motions due by 2/11/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 07/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling & Discovery Order)(mdm)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION (Consent) and [Proposed] Order of Confidentiality by COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION (Borna, Emily)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SHARON ALICE LIM on behalf of COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION Attorney SHARON ALICE LIM added to party COOPER LIGHTING LLC(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON ALICE LIM added to party EATON CORPORATION(pty:dft) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LIM, SHARON)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/16/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 6/16/2020. (far)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION identifying Other Affiliate EATON CORPORATION PLC for EATON CORPORATION; Other Affiliate EATON CORPORATION PLC SIGNIFY NV for COOPER LIGHTING LLC. (Borna, Emily)
June 8, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint filed by COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (mdm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION.(Borna, Emily)Attorney Emily S. Borna added to party COOPER LIGHTING LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily S. Borna added to party EATON CORPORATION(pty:dft)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by GREGORY O WIGGINS (nop)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to COOPER LIGHTING LLC, EATON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mdm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TEMEKA HARPE-MOSES (mdm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by TEMEKA HARPE-MOSES Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3463134, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: William Gregory Dobson, 237770. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3462734, $400 filed by TEMEKA HARPE-MOSES (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Eaton Corporation, #3 Summons Summons to Cooper Lighting, LLC)(DOBSON, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARPE-MOSES v. EATON CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Lighting LLC
Represented By: Emily S. Borna
Represented By: SHARON ALICE LIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: Emily S. Borna
Represented By: SHARON ALICE LIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEMEKA HARPE-MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM GREG DOBSON
Represented By: GREGORY O WIGGINS
Represented By: A DANIELLE MCBRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?