OWENS v. SMITH
Petitioner: WILLIE GENE OWENS
Respondent: WARDEN TAMARSHE SMITH
Case Number: 1:2020cv00127
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Referring Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern District of Georgia; Case Number 1:20-CV-3533. (mdm)
August 26, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/9/2020. (mdm)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 08/26/2020. (mdm)
July 28, 2020 Filing fee Paid: $5, Receipt # 42528 (bcl)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst TAMARSHE SMITH filed by WILLIE GENE OWENS (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Petition, #2 Petition for Writ of Certorari, #3 Remittitur, #4 Order, #5Calhoun County Superior Court Return and Answer, #6 Envelope)(bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN TAMARSHE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILLIE GENE OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?