CROSS v. CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: Aven cross
Defendant: ERIC WIMBERLY, CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA, richard morgan, Christopher R. Craft, hollis smith, Officer ERIC WIMBERLY and Officer CHRIS CRAFT
Case Number: 1:2020cv00138
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/9/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ARASH ALI SABZEVARI on behalf of CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA, CHRIS CRAFT, HOLLIS SMITH Attorney ARASH ALI SABZEVARI added to party CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney ARASH ALI SABZEVARI added to party CHRIS CRAFT(pty:dft), Attorney ARASH ALI SABZEVARI added to party HOLLIS SMITH(pty:dft)(SABZEVARI, ARASH)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA, CHRIS CRAFT, HOLLIS SMITH with Jury Demand.(CHOY, SUN)Attorney SUN S CHOY added to party CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney SUN S CHOY added to party CHRIS CRAFT(pty:dft), Attorney SUN S CHOY added to party HOLLIS SMITH(pty:dft)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by ERIC WIMBERLY with Jury Demand.(CLAY, FRANCES)Attorney FRANCES CLAY added to party ERIC WIMBERLY(pty:dft)
July 23, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by AVEN CROSS ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(sbd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HOLLIS SMITH. (sbd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHRIS CRAFT. (sbd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ERIC WIMBERLY. (sbd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA. (sbd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AVEN CROSS. (sbd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA, Christopher R. Craft, ERIC WIMBERLY, hollis smith Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3520788, $400 filed by Aven cross (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Colquitt, #3 Summons Officer Eric Wimberly, #4 Summons Officer Chris Craft, #5 Summons Hollis Smith, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit C)(MCMILLAN, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROSS v. CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aven cross
Represented By: DOUGLAS MCMILLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC WIMBERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF COLQUITT GEORGIA
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: ARASH ALI SABZEVARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: richard morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hollis smith
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: ARASH ALI SABZEVARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer ERIC WIMBERLY
Represented By: FRANCES CLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer CHRIS CRAFT
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: ARASH ALI SABZEVARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?