ISAAC v. COLEMAN
Petitioner: BENJAMIN EUGENE ISAAC
Respondent: WARDEN JEFF COLEMAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00096. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
August 3, 2020 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia, Thomasville Division. File Transferred Electronically. (MG) [Transferred from gasd on 8/5/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Thomasville Division for further consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 08/03/2020. (MG) [Transferred from gasd on 8/5/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Eugene Isaac, Jr. Responses due by 8/11/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) [Transferred from gasd on 8/5/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Benjamin Eugene Isaac, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MG) [Transferred from gasd on 8/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISAAC v. COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BENJAMIN EUGENE ISAAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN JEFF COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?