HINSON v. MYERS et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR
Defendant: WARDEN MYERS, DEPUTY WARDEN SHAVERS, DEPUTY WARDEN MOBLEY, COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY WARD and DEPUTY WARDEN SPAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00156
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Referring Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Keith Austin by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bcl)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration of Christopher Mark Hinson, Jr. by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(bcl) Modified on 9/30/2020 to correct filing date (bcl).
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Jonathan Daniel Merritt by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bcl)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Christopher Hinson regarding treatment at Autry State Prison. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(bcl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED #1 Complaint against All Defendants by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bcl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) Modified on 9/16/2020 - Amended Complaint attached in error; filed at document #7 (bcl).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to Amend Complaint, and granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 8/27/2020. (TQL)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOBLEY, MYERS, SHAVERS, filed by CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HINSON v. MYERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN SHAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN MOBLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN SPAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MARK HINSON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?