MAJORITY FORWARD et al v. BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. and DEBRA LEWIS
Defendant: DAVID WALKER, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, CINDI DUNLAP, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, UHLAND ROBERTS, LINDA PARKER, NANCY BOREN, GUNDRON MILLS, THOMAS GREEN, BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, PENSON KAMINSKY, DANNY YOUNG, MARGARET JENKINS and ELEANOR WHITE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00266
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 30, 2020. Evidentiary hearing before Judge Abrams Gardner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mindy Martin. Volume Number: 1 of 1. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (MM)
January 25, 2021 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEBRA LEWIS, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR., MAJORITY FORWARD as to All Plaintiffs (SPARKS, ADAM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint/Petition by BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CINDI DUNLAP, THOMAS GREEN, PENSON KAMINSKY, GUNDRON MILLS, DAVID WALKER, DANNY YOUNG with Jury Demand. Related document: #20 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR., DEBRA LEWIS.(PITTMAN, ROSS)
January 14, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAJORITY FORWARD (SPARKS, ADAM)
January 14, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(bcl)
January 14, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #36 Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by ELEANOR WHITE, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, LINDA PARKER, MARGARET JENKINS, NANCY BOREN, UHLAND ROBERTS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION ); Notice to Counsel - Timothy Gristina & Clinton Fay - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. Additionally, per page 7 of the ECF Adminstrative Procedures, all electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. Please include an email address in future filings.(bcl)
January 13, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint/Petition by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE with Jury Demand. Related document: #20 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR., DEBRA LEWIS.(GRISTINA, THOMAS)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #20 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR., DEBRA LEWIS ; denying as moot #24 Motion to Stay Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 1/4/2021. (kcg)
January 1, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to Response filed by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE re #11 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case (CLARK, JAMES)
December 31, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by DEBRA LEWIS, MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. re #11 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case (SPARKS, ADAM)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Recusal. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/31/2020 (jtg)
December 30, 2020 Filing 34 Exhibit List by MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION re Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Boren Declaration - Sealed per LAG Chambers)(bcl) Modified on 1/4/2021 (bcl).
December 30, 2020 Filing 33 Exhibit List by BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS re Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Elector Challenge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Cindi Dunlap, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kathleen Searcy)(bcl)
December 30, 2020 Filing 32 Exhibit List by MAJORITY FORWARD re Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Russell Mass Challenge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of K. Meyer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of G. Turner, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of S. Berson, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of N. Essix, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of S. Pfeiffer Stinetorf, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of A. Luna Colon, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of G. Williams, #9 Exhibit Declaration of J.B. Poersch, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of D. Lewis)(bcl)
December 30, 2020 Filing 31 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER: Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/30/2020. Court Reporter: Mindy Martin.Time in Court: 1 hour 55 mins. (bcl)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #12 on Motion for TRO, the temporary restraining order (Doc. 12) is dissolved, granting in part #20 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR., DEBRA LEWIS Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/30/2020. (kcg)
December 30, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CINDI DUNLAP, THOMAS GREEN, PENSON KAMINSKY, GUNDRON MILLS, DAVID WALKER, DANNY YOUNG re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Section 21-2-230 Elector Challenge, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Cindi Dunlap, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kathleen Searcy)(KINSLEY, NICHOLAS)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JACOB D SHELLY (nop)
December 30, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #21 Affidavit filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR., DEBRA LEWIS ); Document should have been filed as an attachment to DE #20. Document is referred to on Page 6 of the Amended Complaint as "Exhibit 1, Declaration of Debra Lewis." No need to refile.(sbd)
December 30, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #26 Response to Motion, filed by DAVID WALKER, PENSON KAMINSKY, THOMAS GREEN, BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, GUNDRON MILLS, DANNY YOUNG, CINDI DUNLAP ); Signature block did not include an e-mail address as required on page 7 of the CM/ECF procedures manual. No need to refile but information must be included in the future.(sbd)
December 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Temporary Restraining Order re #12 Order on Motion for TRO by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE filed by THOMAS F GRISTINA.(GRISTINA, THOMAS)
December 29, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Boren Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 -- News Article)(GRISTINA, THOMAS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2021: #3 Exhibit 1 - Boern Declaration - Redacted - Sealed per LAG Chambers) (bcl). Modified on 1/4/2021 (bcl).
December 29, 2020 Filing 22 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3667846, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Adam Sparks 341578. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SHELLY, JACOB)
December 29, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Debra Lewis in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by DEBRA LEWIS, MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. (SPARKS, ADAM)
December 29, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CINDI DUNLAP, THOMAS GREEN, PENSON KAMINSKY, GUNDRON MILLS, DAVID WALKER, DANNY YOUNG by GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR., MAJORITY FORWARD, DEBRA LEWIS (SPARKS, ADAM)
December 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgement of Service by Columbus-Muscogee Defendants by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. re #6 Summons Issued,, #2 Order, #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Acknowledgement of Service of Columbus-Muscogee Defendants)(SPARKS, ADAM)
December 29, 2020 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Order, #1 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CINDI DUNLAP, THOMAS GREEN, PENSON KAMINSKY, GUNDRON MILLS, DAVID WALKER, DANNY YOUNG. (KINSLEY, NICHOLAS)
December 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by NICHOLAS A KINSLEY on behalf of BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CINDI DUNLAP, THOMAS GREEN, PENSON KAMINSKY, GUNDRON MILLS, DAVID WALKER, DANNY YOUNG Attorney NICHOLAS A KINSLEY added to party BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS(pty:dft), Attorney NICHOLAS A KINSLEY added to party CINDI DUNLAP(pty:dft), Attorney NICHOLAS A KINSLEY added to party THOMAS GREEN(pty:dft), Attorney NICHOLAS A KINSLEY added to party PENSON KAMINSKY(pty:dft), Attorney NICHOLAS A KINSLEY added to party GUNDRON MILLS(pty:dft), Attorney NICHOLAS A KINSLEY added to party DAVID WALKER(pty:dft), Attorney NICHOLAS A KINSLEY added to party DANNY YOUNG(pty:dft)(KINSLEY, NICHOLAS)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA (nop)
December 29, 2020 Filing 15 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3667305, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Adam Sparks 341578. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(NKWONTA, UZOMA)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MARC E ELIAS (nop)
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3666989, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Adam Sparks 341578. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(ELIAS, MARC)
December 29, 2020 Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/30/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. NOTICE OF SETTING hearing. Hearing will occur IN-PERSON. Counsel, parties, and members of the public and press should review Amended Standing Order 2020-09, available on the courts website, regarding courthouse entrance procedures due to COVID-19. Public access, media, and other interested parties can listen to the hearing by dialing 1-877-810-9415 and entering 7075585 at the time of the hearing. Be advised, the courtroom public gallery has a maximum seating capacity of 18. (far)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 ***DISSOLVED PER #27 ORDER*** ORDER granting #5 Motion for TRO Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/28/2020 (kcg) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit docket text. (mdm)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Transfer Case(, ) by NANCY BOREN, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE filed by THOMAS F GRISTINA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(GRISTINA, THOMAS)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE re #3 Notice of Attorney Appearance,, (GRISTINA, THOMAS)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE re #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance,, (CLARK, JAMES)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 Replaced by D.E. #11 . MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE filed by THOMAS F GRISTINA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(GRISTINA, THOMAS) Modified on 12/28/2020 (tlf).
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Recusal by NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE filed by JAMES C CLARK, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A--Russell Challenge)(CLARK, JAMES)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, NANCY BOREN, CINDI DUNLAP, THOMAS GREEN, MARGARET JENKINS, PENSON KAMINSKY, GUNDRON MILLS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, DAVID WALKER, ELEANOR WHITE, DANNY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dunlap, #2 Summons Young, #3 Summons Jenkins, #4 Summons Muscogee County Board of Elections, #5 Summons Boren, #6 Summons Kaminsky, #7 Summons Green, #8 Summons Roberts, #9 Summons Scrimpshire, #10 Summons White, #11 Summons Mills, #12 Summons Parker, #13 Summons Walker)(mdm)
December 28, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Motion must be re-filed; Related document: #8 Motion to Sever, filed by ELEANOR WHITE, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, LINDA PARKER, MARGARET JENKINS, NANCY BOREN, UHLAND ROBERTS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION; Multiple reliefs were requested in the document yet only one was selected during the filing process. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: Motions with Multiple Reliefs Requested. When a motion requests multiple or alternative reliefs, it is especially important to select multiple reliefs when filing. For instance, with a combined motion to dismiss and motion to strike, you must select both reliefs to dismiss' and 'to strike. You do this by clicking on each motion relief from the drop down menu. You cannot select only the motion to dismiss and then type in the text box and motion to strike:. It is imperative that all relief categories are specifically selected. The Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system will then track each relief as a separate request for action. This helps the court ensure that all matters are properly addressed. Failure to comply with this requirement may result in a request for relief that is not tracked on the pending motion reports used in case management." Document must be re-filed (tlf).
December 28, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related documents: #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance,, filed by ELEANOR WHITE, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, LINDA PARKER, MARGARET JENKINS, NANCY BOREN, UHLAND ROBERTS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION and #3 Notice of Attorney Appearance,, filed by ELEANOR WHITE, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, LINDA PARKER, MARGARET JENKINS, NANCY BOREN, UHLAND ROBERTS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION; NEFs for these docuemnts indicate several persons not served via CM/ECF. Thus, participants must be served outside of CM/ECF and a certificate of service must be entered (tlf).
December 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. filed by ADAM MARTIN SPARKS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - R. Russell Mass Challenge, #3 Exhibit 2 - Decl. of K. Meyer, #4 Exhibit 3 - Decl. of G. Turner, #5 Exhibit 4 - Decl. of S. Berson, #6 Exhibit 5 - Decl. of N. Essix, #7 Exhibit 6 - Decl. of S. Pfeiffer Stinetorf, #8 Exhibit 7 - Decl. of A. Luna Colon, #9 Exhibit 8 - Decl. of G. Williams, #10 Exhibit 9 - Decl. of JB Poersch, #11 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(SPARKS, ADAM)
December 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JAMES C CLARK, JR on behalf of NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party NANCY BOREN(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party MARGARET JENKINS(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party LINDA PARKER(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party UHLAND ROBERTS(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party ELEANOR WHITE(pty:dft)(CLARK, JAMES)
December 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by THOMAS F GRISTINA on behalf of NANCY BOREN, MARGARET JENKINS, MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION, LINDA PARKER, UHLAND ROBERTS, DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE, ELEANOR WHITE Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party NANCY BOREN(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party MARGARET JENKINS(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party LINDA PARKER(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party UHLAND ROBERTS(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party ELEANOR WHITE(pty:dft)(GRISTINA, THOMAS)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SETTING HEARING: re #1 Complaint, filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/30/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/24/2020. (kcg)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3664843, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schmitz Final Order, #2 Exhibit B - Russell Mass Challenge Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPARKS, ADAM)
December 23, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL MARC E ELIAS, UZOMA NKWONTA, JACOB D SHELLY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(bcl)
December 23, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by MAJORITY FORWARD, GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR. ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAJORITY FORWARD et al v. BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAJORITY FORWARD
Represented By: JACOB D SHELLY
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: HALSEY GEORGE KNAPP, JR
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: UZOMA NKWONTA
Represented By: ADAM MARTIN SPARKS
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAMALIEL WARREN TURNER, SR.
Represented By: JACOB D SHELLY
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: HALSEY GEORGE KNAPP, JR
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: UZOMA NKWONTA
Represented By: ADAM MARTIN SPARKS
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA LEWIS
Represented By: ADAM MARTIN SPARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WALKER
Represented By: ROSS H PITTMAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY A ROWELL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE SCRIMPSHIRE
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Represented By: CLIFTON CARTWRIGHT FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINDI DUNLAP
Represented By: ROSS H PITTMAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY A ROWELL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Represented By: CLIFTON CARTWRIGHT FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHLAND ROBERTS
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Represented By: CLIFTON CARTWRIGHT FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA PARKER
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Represented By: CLIFTON CARTWRIGHT FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY BOREN
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Represented By: CLIFTON CARTWRIGHT FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUNDRON MILLS
Represented By: ROSS H PITTMAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY A ROWELL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS GREEN
Represented By: ROSS H PITTMAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY A ROWELL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN HILL COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: ROSS H PITTMAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY A ROWELL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSON KAMINSKY
Represented By: ROSS H PITTMAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY A ROWELL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANNY YOUNG
Represented By: ROSS H PITTMAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY A ROWELL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A KINSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET JENKINS
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Represented By: CLIFTON CARTWRIGHT FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELEANOR WHITE
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Represented By: CLIFTON CARTWRIGHT FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?