PHILLIPS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: MERLIE PHILLIPS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00063
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Referring Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (mdm) Modified on 4/26/2021 to correct docket text.(mdm)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mdm)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mdm)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP, and Directing Service. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 4/19/2021. (TQL)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MERLIE PHILLIPS. (mdm)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MERLIE PHILLIPS filed by GEORGE C PIEMONTE. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by MERLIE PHILLIPS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #4 Summons Attorney General)(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERLIE PHILLIPS
Represented By: GEORGE C PIEMONTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?