CABALLERO v. DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Caballero
Defendant: John A. Dowdy III, Danimer Scientific, Inc., Stephen E. Croskrey, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, STEPHEN E CROSKREY and JOHN A DOWDY, III
Petitioner: JOSEPH BURTNER, JAMES SWANSON, BRADLEY J SHAK, MEHDI GHOMESHI, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, KIERAN H DUFFY and SUSAN B DUFFY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00095
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 30 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JAMES SWANSON Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3846436, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: W. Thomas Lacy, 431032. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(KATHREIN, REED)
July 16, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases(, ), MOTION Consolidate Cases, Appoint Counsel, and Miscellaneous Relief. by JOSEPH BURTNER filed by JOYCE GIST LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #2 Affidavit Declaration ISO Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration (PSLRA Notice), #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration (Certification), #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration (Loss chart), #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration (KF Firm Bio), #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (KH Firm Bio))(LEWIS, JOYCE)
July 16, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #24 Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by JAMES SWANSON ); This motion contains multiple motions within one document. Multiple motion types should have been selected during docketing. Document must be re-filed using correct event: (1) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (2) Motion to Appoint Counsel, and (3) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief.(mdm)
July 16, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - REED R. KATHREIN, LUCAS E. GILMORE, DANIELLE SMITH, WESLEY WONG, & STEVE BERMAN: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm)
July 16, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - JEFFREY P. CAMPISO: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm) Modified on 7/16/2021 - Sada J. Baby has already met admission requirements. (mdm).
July 16, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - JAVIER BLEICHMAR & BRIAN SCHALL: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm)
July 16, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #23 Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by JOSEPH BURTNER ); This motion contains multiple motions within one document. Multiple motion types should have been selected during docketing. Document must be re-filed using correct event: (1) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (2) Motion to Appoint Counsel, and (3) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief.(mdm)
July 16, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #28 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by SUSAN B DUFFY, KIERAN H DUFFY, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, MEHDI GHOMESHI ); This motion contains multiple motions within one document. Multiple motion types should have been selected during docketing. Document must be re-filed using correct event: (1) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (2) Motion to Appoint Counsel, and (3) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief.(mdm) When refiling document, the exhibits must and attached separately and include a description of each exhibit. (mdm)
July 16, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #26 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by BRADLEY J SHAK ). This motion contains multiple motions within one document. Multiple motion types should have been selected during docketing. Document must be re-filed using correct event: (1) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (2) Motion to Appoint Counsel, and (3) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief.(mdm)
July 16, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #27 Notice (Other), filed by SUSAN B DUFFY, KIERAN H DUFFY, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, MEHDI GHOMESHI ); This motion contains multiple motions within one document. Multiple motion types should have been selected during docketing. Document must be re-filed using correct event: (1) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (2) Motion to Appoint Counsel, and (3) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief.(mdm)
July 16, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - ROBERT V. PRONGAY, CHARLES H. LINEHAN, LESLEY PORTNOY, & MICHAEL C. FASANO: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm)
July 15, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION by KIERAN H DUFFY, SUSAN B DUFFY, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, MEHDI GHOMESHI filed by COREY DANIEL HOLZER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EDNY Motion)(HOLZER, COREY)
July 14, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of the filing of the Ghomeshi and Duffy Groups Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel filed in the Eastern District of New York by Mehdi Ghomeshi, Ali Razzy Ghomeshi, Kieran H. Duffy, Susan B. Duffy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EDNY Motion)(HOLZER, COREY)
July 13, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION Motion of Bradley J. Shak for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions by Bradley J. Shak filed by DAVID A BAIN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Bain, #3 Exhibit A: PSLRA Certification, #4 Exhibit B: Rosencrants PSLRA Notice, #5 Exhibit C: Caballero PSLRA Notice, #6 Exhibit D: Wilkins PSLRA Notice, #7 Exhibit E: Skistimas PSLRA Notice, #8 Exhibit F: Chart of Financial Interest, #9 Exhibit G: Shak Declaration, #10 Exhibit H: BFA Resume, #11 Proposed Order)(BAIN, DAVID)
July 13, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DAVID A BAIN on behalf of Bradley J. Shak Attorney DAVID A BAIN added to party Bradley J. Shak(pty:mov)(BAIN, DAVID)
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by James Swanson filed by WILLIAM THOMAS LACY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Movant's Certification, #5 Exhibit Movant's Loss, #6 Exhibit Movant's Declaration, #7 Exhibit Press Release, #8 Exhibit Hagens Berman Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit Lindsey & Lacy, PC Firm Resume)(LACY, WILLIAM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Joseph Burtner filed by Joyce Gist Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #2 Affidavit Declaration ISO Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration (PSLRA Notice), #4 Exhibit B to Declaration (Certification), #5 Exhibit C to Declaration (Loss chart), #6 Exhibit D to Declaration (KF Firm Bio), #7 Exhibit E to Declaration (KH Firm Bio))(Lewis, Joyce)
June 30, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Aris Haigian by STEPHEN E CROSKREY, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, JOHN A DOWDY, III filed by BRIAN M LUTZ. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LUTZ, BRIAN)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JEFFREY H DAICHMAN. (mdm)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DANA M SUSMAN (mdm)
June 30, 2021 Filing 19 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by STEPHEN E CROSKREY, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, JOHN A DOWDY, III Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3832720, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: John Thomas Cox III, State of Georgia Bar Number #192530. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DAICHMAN, JEFFREY)
June 30, 2021 Filing 18 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by STEPHEN E CROSKREY, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, JOHN A DOWDY, III Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3832697, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: John Thomas Cox III, State of Georgia Bar Number #192530. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SUSMAN, DANA)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JONATHAN DAVID FORTNEY (mdm)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BRIAN M LUTZ. (mdm)
June 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOHN THOMAS COX, III on behalf of STEPHEN E CROSKREY, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, JOHN A DOWDY, III Attorney JOHN THOMAS COX, III added to party STEPHEN E CROSKREY(pty:dft), Attorney JOHN THOMAS COX, III added to party DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC(pty:dft), Attorney JOHN THOMAS COX, III added to party JOHN A DOWDY, III(pty:dft)(COX, JOHN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by STEPHEN E CROSKREY, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, JOHN A DOWDY, III Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3828590, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: John Thomas Cox III, 192530. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(FORTNEY, JONATHAN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by STEPHEN E CROSKREY, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, JOHN A DOWDY, III Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3828588, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: John Thomas Cox III, 192530. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(LUTZ, BRIAN)
June 16, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - TREY COX, BRIAN M. LUTZ, JONATHAN D. FORTNEY, ARIS HAIGIAN, & DANA M. SUSMAN: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Putative Class Action Complaint. by CARLOS CABALLERO filed by Homer Lamar Mixson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mixson, Homer)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by REBECCA NAHEE KIM. (mdm)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by SCOTT FOGLIETTA. (mdm)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by AVI JOSEFSON. (mdm)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service by CARLOS CABALLERO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(PETERSON, JENNIFER)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CARLOS CABALLERO Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3805258, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: H. Lamar Mixson, 514012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(KIM, REBECCA)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CARLOS CABALLERO Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3805235, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: H. Lamar Mixson, 514012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(FOGLIETTA, SCOTT)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CARLOS CABALLERO Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3805186, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: H. Lamar Mixson, 514012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JOSEFSON, AVI)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AMANDA KAY SEALS on behalf of CARLOS CABALLERO (SEALS, AMANDA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to STEPHEN E CROSKREY, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, & JOHN A DOWDY, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mdm)
May 19, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - AVI JOSEFSON, SCOTT FOGLIETTA, & REBECCA KIM: - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm)
May 19, 2021 Notice of Deficiency - ATTORNEY CASE OPENING: Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(mdm)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JENNIFER PETERSON on behalf of Carlos Caballero Attorney JENNIFER PETERSON added to party Carlos Caballero(pty:pla)(PETERSON, JENNIFER)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen E. Croskrey, Danimer Scientific, Inc., John A. Dowdy III Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3798945, $402 filed by Carlos Caballero (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Danimer Scientific, Inc., #4 Summons to Stephen E. Croskrey, #5 Summons to John A. Dowdy III)(Mixson, Homer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CABALLERO v. DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Caballero
Represented By: Homer Lamar Mixson
Represented By: JENNIFER PETERSON
Represented By: AMANDA KAY SEALS
Represented By: AVI JOSEFSON
Represented By: REBECCA NAHEE KIM
Represented By: SCOTT FOGLIETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Dowdy III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danimer Scientific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen E. Croskrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC
Represented By: BRIAN M LUTZ
Represented By: DANA M SUSMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY H DAICHMAN
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS COX, III
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID FORTNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN E CROSKREY
Represented By: BRIAN M LUTZ
Represented By: DANA M SUSMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY H DAICHMAN
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS COX, III
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID FORTNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A DOWDY, III
Represented By: BRIAN M LUTZ
Represented By: DANA M SUSMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY H DAICHMAN
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS COX, III
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID FORTNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEPH BURTNER
Represented By: JOYCE GIST LEWIS
Represented By: SADA JACOBSON BABY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES SWANSON
Represented By: REED R KATHREIN
Represented By: WILLIAM THOMAS LACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRADLEY J SHAK
Represented By: DAVID A BAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MEHDI GHOMESHI
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIERAN H DUFFY
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUSAN B DUFFY
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?