WILKINS v. DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS H WILKINS
Defendant: John P Amboian, Gregory Hunt, John A. Dowdy III, Philip Calhoun, Danimer Scientific, Inc., Richard Hendrix, Stephen E. Croskrey, Isao Noda, Christy Basco, Stuart W. Pratt, DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC, STEPHEN E CROSKREY, JOHN A DOWDY, III, PHILIP GREGORY CALHOUN and STUART W PRATT
Petitioner: JOSEPH BURTNER, JAMES SWANSON, BRADLEY J SHAK, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, MEHDI GHOMESHI, KIERAN H DUFFY and SUSAN B DUFFY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00096
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases,, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by SUSAN B DUFFY, KIERAN H DUFFY, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, MEHDI GHOMESHI ) - This motion contains multiple motions within one document. Multiple motion types should have been selected during docketing. The motion has been corrected by the case administrator. Case Administrator will regenerate the NEF to reflect the changes to the docket text.(bcl)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION for Appointment of Movants the Ghomeshi and Duffy Group as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION for Approval of Lead Counsel for Movants the Ghomeshi and Duffy Group by KIERAN H DUFFY, SUSAN B DUFFY, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, MEHDI GHOMESHI filed by COREY DANIEL HOLZER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EDNY Motion)(HOLZER, COREY) Modified on 7/16/2021 to correct event type. (bcl). Added MOTION, MOTION to Appoint Counsel on 7/16/2021 (bcl).
July 15, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert V. Prongay, Charles H. Linehan, Lesley Portnoy & Michael C. Fasano - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(bcl) Modified on 7/15/2021 (bcl).
July 15, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Notice (Other), filed by SUSAN B DUFFY, KIERAN H DUFFY, ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI, MEHDI GHOMESHI ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Addtionally, document must be re-filed using correct event. The correct event is Motion for Miscellaneous Relief.(bcl)
July 15, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by BRADLEY J SHAK, #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by JAMES SWANSON, #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by JOSEPH BURTNER ); All of these motions contain multiple motions within one document. Multiple motion types should have been selected during docketing. All motions have been corrected by the case administrator. Case Administrator will regenerate the NEFs to reflect the changes to the docket text.(ans)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of the filing of the Ghomeshi and Duffy Groups Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel filed in the Eastern District of New York by Ali Razzy Ghomeshi, Mehdi Ghomeshi, Kieran H. Duffy, Susan B. Duffy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EDNY Motion)(HOLZER, COREY)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeffrey P. Campisi - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(bcl)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Reed R. Katherin, Lucas E. Gilmore, Danielle Smith, Wesley A. Wong & Steve W. Berman - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(bcl)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Javier Bleichmar & Brian Schall - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(bcl)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to appoint Movant Bradley J. Shak as Lead Plaintiff, and MOTION for Approval of Movant's Selection of Lead Counsel for the Class by Bradley J. Shak filed by DAVID A BAIN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Bain, #3 Exhibit A: PSLRA Certification, #4 Exhibit B: Rosencrants PSLRA Notice, #5 Exhibit C: Caballero PSLRA Notice, #6 Exhibit D: Wilkins PSLRA Notice, #7 Exhibit E: Skistimas PSLRA Notice, #8 Exhibit F: Chart of Financial Interest, #9 Exhibit G: Shak Declaration, #10 Exhibit H: BFA Resume, #11 Proposed Order)(BAIN, DAVID) Modified on 7/15/2021 (ans). Added MOTION on 7/15/2021 (ans). Added MOTION on 7/15/2021 (ans).
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DAVID A BAIN on behalf of Bradley J. Shak Attorney DAVID A BAIN added to party Bradley J. Shak(pty:mov)(BAIN, DAVID)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint JAMES SWANSON as lead plaintiff, and MOTION to approve JAMES SWANSON's selection of Lead and Liason Counsel for the class by JAMES SWANSON filed by WILLIAM THOMAS LACY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Movant's Certification, #5 Exhibit Movant's Loss, #6 Exhibit Movant's Declaration, #7 Exhibit Press Release, #8 Exhibit Hagens Berman Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit Lindsey & Lacy, PC Firm Resume)(LACY, WILLIAM). Added MOTION on 7/15/2021 (ans). Added MOTION on 7/15/2021 (ans).
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint JOSEPH BURTNER as lead plaintiff, and MOTION to approve JOSEPH BURTNER's selection of Kaplan Fox to serve as Lead Counsel for the Class, and Krevolin & Horst, LLC as Liaison Counsel by JOSEPH BURTNER filed by Joyce Gist Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #2 Affidavit Declaration ISO Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration (PSLRA Notice), #4 Exhibit B to Declaration (Certification), #5 Exhibit C to Declaration (Loss chart), #6 Exhibit D to Declaration (KF Firm Bio), #7 Exhibit E to Declaration (KH Firm Bio))(Lewis, Joyce). Added MOTION to Appoint JOSEPH BURTNER as lead plaintiff, and MOTION to approve JOSEPH BURTNER's selection of Kaplan Fox to serve as Lead Counsel for the Class, and Krevolin & Horst, LLC as Liaison Counsel on 7/15/2021 (ans).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JEFFREY C BLOCK. (mdm)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JACOB A WALKER. (mdm)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DENNIS H WILKINS Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3803385, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Marshall P. Dees (105766). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(BLOCK, JEFFREY)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DENNIS H WILKINS Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3803379, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Marshall P. Dees (105766). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(WALKER, JACOB)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bcl)
May 19, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL JEFFREY C BLOCK, JACOB A WALKER - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(bcl)
May 19, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, Plaintiff was not added as a party when case was opened. Please be sure to include all parties. NO NEED TO REFILE.(bcl)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3799000, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Certification, #2 Summons Amboian, #3 Summons Basco, #4 Summons Calhoun, #5 Summons Croskey, #6 Summons Danimer, #7 Summons Dowdy, #8 Summons Hendrix, #9 Summons Hunt, #10 Summons Noda, #11 Summons Pratt, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(HOLZER, COREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILKINS v. DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Amboian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Dowdy III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danimer Scientific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen E. Croskrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isao Noda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Basco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart W. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIMER SCIENTIFIC INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN E CROSKREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A DOWDY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP GREGORY CALHOUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART W PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS H WILKINS
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Represented By: JACOB A WALKER
Represented By: JEFFREY C BLOCK
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEPH BURTNER
Represented By: JOYCE GIST LEWIS
Represented By: SADA JACOBSON BABY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES SWANSON
Represented By: WILLIAM THOMAS LACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRADLEY J SHAK
Represented By: DAVID A BAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALI RAZZY GHOMESHI
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MEHDI GHOMESHI
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIERAN H DUFFY
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUSAN B DUFFY
Represented By: MARSHALL P DEES
Represented By: COREY DANIEL HOLZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?