PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY v. Smith et al
Petitioner: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Respondent: Justin Deion Smith, L & B Transport, LLC, Alphonza Bowens and L & B TRANSPORT LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00201
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Motion for Entry of Default filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY, #12 Motion for Entry of Default filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY, #13 Motion for Entry of Default filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Application to Clerk for Entry of Default.(mdm)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 6/20/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/19/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling & Discovery Order)(mdm)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Respondent Justin Deion Smith by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by JENA GRACE EMORY.(EMORY, JENA)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Respondent L & B Transport, LLC by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by JENA GRACE EMORY.(EMORY, JENA)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Respondent Alphonza Bowens by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by JENA GRACE EMORY.(EMORY, JENA)
December 20, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Summons Returned Executed filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Wrong event used. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager. The correct event is Certificate of Service.(mdm)
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Service by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY as to JUSTIN DEION SMITH. (EMORY, JENA) Modified on 12/20/2021 (mdm).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 11/29/2021. (mdm)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/27/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 11/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by L & B TRANSPORT LLC filed by VICTORIA E MUNIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Order)(MUNIAN, VICTORIA)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Respondent Alphonza Bowens by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (EMORY, JENA)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Respondent L & B Transport by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (EMORY, JENA)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ALPHONZA BOWENS, L & B TRANSPORT LLC, JUSTIN DEION SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mdm)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (EMORY, JENA)
October 29, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(mdm)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent DRIVE INSURANCE HOLDINGS INC for PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (EMORY, JENA)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alphonza Bowens, L & B Transport, LLC, Justin Deion Smith Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3934941, $402 filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- DJA Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons of Justin Smith, #4 Summons Summons of L & B Transport, #5 Summons Summons of Alphonza Bowens, #6 Required Form Jurisdictional Statement)(EMORY, JENA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JENA GRACE EMORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Justin Deion Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L & B Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alphonza Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L & B TRANSPORT LLC
Represented By: VICTORIA E MUNIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?