THREADCRAFT v. ASPIRE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH & DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY SERVICES
Petitioner: Angeline Threadcraft
Respondent: Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services, Albany Area Community Service Board and Aspire BHDD Services
Case Number: 1:2022cv00073
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Filing 16 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 1/6/2023. Dispositive motions due by 2/6/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 07/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling & Dscovery Order)(mdm)
June 9, 2022 Filing 15 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/11/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 6/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
June 3, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ASPIRE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH & DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY SERVICES ); The signature block does not include the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(mdm)
June 2, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASPIRE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH & DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY SERVICES (WILL, DAVID)
June 1, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Answer to Complaint, filed by ASPIRE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH & DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY SERVICES ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(mdm)
May 31, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-01119. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Change Venue. This matter is to be TRANSFERRED to the USDC MDGA, ALBANY DIVISION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 5/31/2022. (tas) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Case electronically transferred to District of Middle Georgia, Albany Division. (tas) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon terminated from case. (tas) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
May 31, 2022 US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER added. (bcl)
May 20, 2022 Submission of #11 Consent MOTION to Change Venue , to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (tas) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
May 19, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by Angeline Threadcraft. (Lakraj, Adeash) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/25/2022. (tas) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services. Discovery ends on 9/19/2022.(Will, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Answer and Defenses by Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services.(Will, David) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services. (Will, David) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Will on behalf of Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services (Will, David) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by April 29, 2022, why default should not be entered against it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/19/2022. (jra) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Angeline Threadcraft Notice of Leave May 20, 23-27, 30-31, 2022; June 1-3, 2022 (Lakraj, Adeash) Modified on 4/6/2022 to edit docket text (abm). [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services. Answer due 4/12/2022(Lakraj, Adeash) Modified on 3/25/2022 to edit docket text (abm). [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services. (cavc) [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Angeline Threadcraft. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11668822) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cavc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 5/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THREADCRAFT v. ASPIRE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH & DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aspire Behavioral Health & Developmental Disability Services
Represented By: DAVID C WILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Albany Area Community Service Board
Represented By: DAVID C WILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aspire BHDD Services
Represented By: DAVID C WILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angeline Threadcraft
Represented By: ADEASH LAKRAJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?