LEE v. EDWARDS et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Leonardo Lee
Defendant: Gregory W. Edwards, NAKIA BUTLER and GREGORY W EDWARDS
Case Number: 1:2024cv00051
Filed: April 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 11 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GREGORY W EDWARDS (LONES, LAURA)
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by ANTONIO LEONARDO LEE re #8 MOTION to Stay proceedings re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (TODMAN, KAREEM)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by ANTONIO LEONARDO LEE re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (TODMAN, KAREEM)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay proceedings re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GREGORY W EDWARDS filed by LAURA LOUISE LONES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(LONES, LAURA)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/10/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 5/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(fad)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GREGORY W EDWARDS filed by LAURA LOUISE LONES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LONES, LAURA)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NAKIA BUTLER with Jury Demand.(CLAY, FRANCES)Attorney FRANCES CLAY added to party NAKIA BUTLER(pty:dft)
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE Proof of Service by ANTONIO LEONARDO LEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(TODMAN, KAREEM)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Notice of Proof of Service by ANTONIO LEONARDO LEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(TODMAN, KAREEM)
April 10, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NAKIA BUTLER, GREGORY W EDWARDS. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bcl)
April 10, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ANTONIO LEONARDO LEE ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(bcl)
April 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonio Leonardo Lee Fee paid: Receipt # BGAMDC-4620413, $405 filed by Antonio Leonardo Lee (TODMAN, KAREEM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2024: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (bcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. EDWARDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Leonardo Lee
Represented By: KAREEM L TODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAKIA BUTLER
Represented By: FRANCES CLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY W EDWARDS
Represented By: LAURA LOUISE LONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?