Stafford et al v Mentor Corporation
Plaintiff: Shirley Stafford and Torrence Pinkney
Defendant: Mentor Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv00101
Filed: September 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Athens Office
County: Clarke
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER re evidence of substantially similar ObTape Complications. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 05/28/2010. (CGC) Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER re 275 in 4:08-md-02004-CDL, Mentor's Motion in Limine #16 re Exclusion of Argument or Claims That Mentor Withdrew or Recalled ObTape or that Mentor Replaced ObTape with Aris. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 05/20/2010. (CGC)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER denying 298 Motion for Reconsideration re Motion to Sever; granting 291 Motion for Reconsideration re Motion in Limine concerning Dr. Suzanne Bush; declining to reconsider denial of Mentor's Motion in Limine No. 14; declining to adopt Plaintiffs' failure to warn theory; permitting use of video cameras in courtroom for limited purposes; ruling on trial structure. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 05/18/2010. (CGC) Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford et al v Mentor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Stafford
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrence Pinkney
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Corporation
Represented By: James Joseph Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?