Shepard v. Clarke County Police Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Rodney G. Shepard
Defendant: Joseph Lumpkin, Jeff Clark, Ira Edwards and Johnson
Case Number: 3:2008cv00007
Filed: January 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Athens Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claude W. Hicks, Jr.
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 125 Motion to Reopen the Appellate Filing Period. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 06/01/2009. (CGC)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 115 Report and Recommendations; adopting Report and Recommendations re 116 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 12/31/2008. (ggs)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RECOMMENDATION to grant 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants Johnson and Edwards. Objections to R&R due by 11/14/2008. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Claude W. Hicks, Jr. on 10/31/08. (CWH)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Compel; denying 44 Motion to Compel; denying 99 Motion to Compel. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Claude W. Hicks, Jr. on 10/21/08. (CWH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard v. Clarke County Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney G. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?