Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation v. Maxie Enterprises Inc et al

Counter_defendant: Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation
Plaintiff: Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation
Defendant: Maxie Enterprises Inc and Paul Rubin
Counter_claimant: Paul Rubin and Maxie Enterprises Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00022
Filed: February 17, 2011
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Athens Office
County: Oconee
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 06/21/2012. (CGC)
February 10, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 02/10/2012. (CGC)
January 24, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 23 Motion to Compel; deferring ruling on 23 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 01/24/2012. (CGC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation v. Maxie Enterprises Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation
Represented By: Robert E. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation
Represented By: Robert E. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxie Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Steven Bradley Shipe
Represented By: Michael S. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rubin
Represented By: Steven Bradley Shipe
Represented By: Michael S. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Paul Rubin
Represented By: Michael S. Rosenthal
Represented By: Steven Bradley Shipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Maxie Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Michael S. Rosenthal
Represented By: Steven Bradley Shipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?