ROWLAND v. Cleveland et al
Plaintiff: HENRY MARSHALL ROWLAND
Defendant: Mike Cleveland, Bobby Milford, Evans and MIKE ADAMS
Case Number: 3:2011cv00122
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Athens Office
County: Hart
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
Presiding Judge: Charles H Weigle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 18 Report and Recommendations; granting 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 2/28/2013. (ggs)***
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Response to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Milford. Ordered by U.S. Mag. Judge Charles H. Weigle on 5/29/12. (mgb) ***
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 6 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 1/24/2012. *** (ggs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROWLAND v. Cleveland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY MARSHALL ROWLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Milford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?