SHELNUTT v. KROGER CO.

Plaintiff: BARBARA SHELNUTT
Defendant: SHERRY BURKE, KROGER CO, JOHN DOE, ABC CORP NO 2 and ABC CORP NO 1
Case Number: 3:2018cv00051
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Athens Office
County: Walton
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2018 28 AMENDED SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 3/15/2019. Dispositive motions due by 4/15/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 12/19/2018. (lap)
December 7, 2018 27 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER re #25 Discovery Status Report, #26 Discovery Status Report. Discovery in this case is hereby extended until December 17, 2018. On December 17, 2018, the parties must submit a Proposed Amended Scheduling/Discovery Order setting forth the specific dates by which fact and expert discovery is to be completed. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 12/7/2018. (ssh)
November 30, 2018 26 Discovery Status Report (WASICK, JEFFREY)
November 30, 2018 25 Discovery Status Report (STASTNY, A)
November 20, 2018 24 Discovery Order Memorandum sent to parties.(ggs)
October 31, 2018 23 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #22 Second Joint Motion to Stay. Discovery is this case is hereby STAYED through December 3, 2018. Following the rescheduled mediation, but no later than December 3, 2018, the parties must inform the Court on the status of this case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 10/31/2018. (ssh)
October 30, 2018 22 JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by KROGER CO filed by JEFFREY M WASICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Second Motion to Stay Proceedings)(WASICK, JEFFREY)
September 11, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay Discovery pending mediation. Following meditation, the parties must inform the Court on the status of the case, and if the case has not fully resolved, the parties must submit a proposed first amended Scheduling Order for the Courts consideration by October 31, 2018 in accordance with this Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 9/11/2018 (lap)
September 6, 2018 20 JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by KROGER CO filed by JEFFREY M WASICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings)(WASICK, JEFFREY)
July 24, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER granting #18 Motion to Dismiss Party. Defendants ABC Corp. No. 1, ABC Corp. No. 2, and John Doe are hereby DISMISSED and dropped as Defendants in this action. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 7/24/2018 (lap)
June 25, 2018 18 MOTION to Dismiss Party ABC CORP NO 1, ABC CORP NO 2, JOHN DOE by KROGER CO filed by JEFFREY M WASICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Drop and Dismiss Fictional Defendants)(WASICK, JEFFREY)
June 25, 2018 17 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss Party Sherry Burke; granting #16 Consent Motion to Dismiss and Drop Sherry Burke as a Party Defendant. The parties consent and agree that Sherry Burke has been misjoined as a party defendant in this case. Thus, Sherry Burke is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice from this action. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/25/2018. (ssh)
June 21, 2018 16 CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party SHERRY BURKE by KROGER CO filed by JEFFREY M WASICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss and Drop Sherry Burke as a Party Defendant)(WASICK, JEFFREY)
June 20, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Withdrawal of Motion filed by BARBARA SHELNUTT ); The applicable motion being withdrawn was not selected and linked to this document, therefore the motion was not terminated. NO NEED TO REFILE, the applicable motion will be terminated by case manager. (ggs)
June 20, 2018 15 WITHDRAWAL of Motion (STASTNY, A)
June 20, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Motion to Withdraw Document filed by BARBARA SHELNUTT ); Document must be refiled using correct event "WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION" located under "Other Filings" - "Other Documents". By using this event, the motion is automatically terminated. (ggs)
June 20, 2018 14 MOTION to Withdraw Document, by BARBARA SHELNUTT filed by A CHRIS STASTNY.(STASTNY, A)
June 6, 2018 13 RESPONSE filed by KROGER CO re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Attorneys' Fees (WASICK, JEFFREY)
June 6, 2018 12 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by KROGER CO re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Attorneys' Fees (WASICK, JEFFREY)
June 6, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by KROGER CO re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Attorneys' Fees (WASICK, JEFFREY)
May 16, 2018 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Attorneys' Fees by BARBARA SHELNUTT filed by A CHRIS STASTNY.(STASTNY, A) Modified on 6/20/2018 (ggs). ***MOTION TERMINATED pursuant to Withdrawal of motion filed at Tab 15***
May 16, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BARBARA SHELNUTT, SUMMONS Returned Executed by BARBARA SHELNUTT as to SHERRY BURKE, KROGER CO. (STASTNY, A)
May 16, 2018 8 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 11/5/2018. Dispositive motions due by 12/5/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 5/16/2018. (lap)
April 17, 2018 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 5/17/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 4/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(lap)
April 16, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint by SHERRY BURKE.(WASICK, JEFFREY) Modified on 4/17/2018 to reflect correct filing party. (ggs).
April 16, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by KROGER CO.(WASICK, JEFFREY)
April 16, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by KROGER CO ); Other. The Answers of Defendants Kroger and Burke should be filed as separate docket entries and not made as attachments to the Notice of Removal. Please refile the Answers. (ggs)
April 16, 2018 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BARBARA SHELNUTT (ggs)
April 16, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by KROGER CO. ); Attorney Case Opening - Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization - The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES) - Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties - For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia - NO NEED TO REFILE. (ggs)
April 16, 2018 3 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Party SHERRY BURKE by KROGER CO. filed by JEFFREY M WASICK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Sherry Burke)(WASICK, JEFFREY)
April 16, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KROGER CO. (WASICK, JEFFREY)
April 16, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2854476, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit Kroger's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Sherry Burke's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Jury Demand)(WASICK, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHELNUTT v. KROGER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA SHELNUTT
Represented By: ANTHONY STASTNY
Represented By: MICHAEL G GEOFFROY
Represented By: A CHRIS STASTNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRY BURKE
Represented By: JEFFREY M WASICK
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KROGER CO
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Represented By: JEFFREY M WASICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP NO 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP NO 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?