HARRISON v. BEC GROUP INC, et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES HARRISON
Defendant: BEC GROUP INC, BRAKAT ENTERPRISES INC, BRATT FOODS INC, CMB FOODS INC and ENCORE FOODS INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00132
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Amended Complaint/Petition, filed by CHARLES HARRISON ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, party names corrected by case manager. (ggs)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against BEC GROUP INC, BRATT FOODS, INC., BRAKAT ENTERPRISES, INC., CMB FOODS, INC., ENCORE FOODS, INC. by CHARLES HARRISON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Charles Harrison Consent to Sue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Omar Liverman, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Accounting of Hours, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Administrative Notice 14-12, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Sample Pay Stub from Brakat Enterprises, Inc., #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Sample Pay Stub from CMB Foods, Inc., #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Sample Pay Stub from Encore Foods, Inc.)(SHANNON, JENNELL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEC GROUP INC (Henry, Christian)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/14/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/2/2018. (ggs)
November 1, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Complaint filed by BEC GROUP INC ); Document is a Corporate Disclosure Statement and not an answer to the complaint. Document must be refiled using correct event. The correct event is "CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT" located under "Other Filings" - "Other Documents"(ggs)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by TIMOTHY J BECKER (nop)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD - INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED*** ANSWER to Complaint by BEC GROUP INC with Jury Demand.(Henry, Christian) Modified on 11/2/2018 (ggs).
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by BEC GROUP INC with Jury Demand.(Henry, Christian)Attorney Christian Goodloe Henry added to party BEC GROUP INC(pty:dft)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JENNELL K SHANNON (nop)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARLES HARRISON as to BEC GROUP INC. (CONLEY, CALE)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARLES HARRISON as to BEC GROUP INC. (CONLEY, CALE)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BEC GROUP INC. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by CHARLES HARRISON ); Generic descriptions of exhibits and other attachments are not permitted (i.e. Exhibit A). Future filings containing exhibits must include a description of the exhibit. Correction to the exhibits and attachments to the complaint made by case manager. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Charles Harrison ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE - corrected by case manager. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL TIMOTHY J BECKER, JENNELL K SHANNON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BEC Group, Inc. Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2991454, $400 filed by Charles Harrison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dated 8/30/18, #3 Exhibit C - Overtime Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Administrative Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(CONLEY, CALE) Modified on 10/4/2018 to add description of exhibits. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRISON v. BEC GROUP INC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES HARRISON
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BECKER
Represented By: JENNELL K SHANNON
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEC GROUP INC
Represented By: Christian Goodloe Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAKAT ENTERPRISES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRATT FOODS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMB FOODS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENCORE FOODS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?