GUINN v. SETERUS INC
Plaintiff: JAMES J GUINN
Defendant: SETERUS INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00135
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by JAMES J GUINN re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss must be filed by December 4, 2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 11/2/2018. (ssh)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Filed by JAMES J GUINN. (Attachments: #1 Notie of Manual Filing, #2 Proposed Order)(ggs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SETERUS INC filed by Dewan Sharmin Arefin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment from Prestige to Chase, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment from Chase to Fannie Mae, #4 Exhibit D - Chapter 13 petition)(Arefin, Dewan) Modified on 10/17/2018 to remove duplicate text. (ggs).
October 17, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SETERUS INC ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and refiled. Additionally, exhibits should be attached to the main document. Exhibits must be identified with a description and not a generic name (i.e. Exhibit A). Document must be refilled in a text-searchable PDF format with the exhibits pulled in as attachments and properly identified. (ggs)
October 17, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SETERUS INC, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by SETERUS INC ); The case number on these documents is incorrect. The correct case number is 3:18-135. NO NEED TO REFILE, please put the correct case number on future documents.(ggs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 ***TERMINATED - REFILED AT TAB 5*** MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SETERUS INC filed by Dewan Sharmin Arefin.(Arefin, Dewan) Modified on 10/17/2018 (ggs).
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SETERUS INC identifying Corporate Parent Pixel Acquisition Corp., Corporate Parent Kyanite Services, Inc., Corporate Parent International Business Machines Corporation for SETERUS INC. (Arefin, Dewan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAMES J GUINN (ggs)
October 10, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal filed by SETERUS INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (ggs)
October 10, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal filed by Seterus ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, corrections made by case manager. (ggs)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Seterus Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2994568, $400 filed by Seterus (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Arefin, Dewan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUINN v. SETERUS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J GUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETERUS INC
Represented By: Dewan Sharmin Arefin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?