GARCIA v. ATHENA CAPITAL LLC
Plaintiff: JAMES GARCIA
Defendant: ATHENA CAPITAL LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00136
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DAVID W GARRISON (nop)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JOSHUA A FRANK (nop)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES GARCIA. as to ATHENA CAPITAL LLC (MOORE, MICHAEL)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Consent to Join Action (FLSA) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff)(MOORE, MICHAEL)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATHENA CAPITAL LLC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2995290, $400 filed by JAMES GARCIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint (July 11-24 Earnings Statement), #2 Exhibit B to Complaint (August 8-21 Earnings Statement), #3 Exhibit C to Complaint (June 27-July 10 Earnings Statement), #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(MOORE, MICHAEL)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL DAVID W GARRISON, JOSHUA A FRANK - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARCIA v. ATHENA CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GARCIA
Represented By: AIMEE J HALL
Represented By: JOSHUA A FRANK
Represented By: DAVID W GARRISON
Represented By: MICHAEL J MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENA CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?