HARRIS v. SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MINOR CHILD and NYISHA HARRIS
Defendant: SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2018cv00146
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE J ABRAMS
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE filed by SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #3 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Declaration of Cole Cruz, #2 Exhibit 1 - Policy-Certificate)(NIETO, ANDREA)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by NYISHA HARRIS filed by Kenneth Kalivoda. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief, #2 Affidavit Affidavit)(Kalivoda, Kenneth)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY for SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (NIETO, ANDREA)
November 20, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
November 16, 2018 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS no longer assigned to the case. (ggs)
November 15, 2018 This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO Athens Division Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement. (bcl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against MINOR CHILD(K S BENNETT BY NEXT FRIEND NYISHA HARRIS), MINOR CHILD(K T BENNETT BY NEXT FRIEND NYISHA HARRIS) Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3020936, $400 filed by SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's First Requst for Production, #7 Exhibit 6 - Policy)(NIETO, ANDREA) Modified on 11/16/2018 to edit docket text. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINOR CHILD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYISHA HARRIS
Represented By: Kenneth Kalivoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREA E NIETO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?