DAVIS v. HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC
Plaintiff: TRINA DAVIS
Defendant: HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00051
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC (Davis, Bradley)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC.(Davis, Bradley)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendant must Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 18, 2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/24/2019. (ssh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC filed by JUSTIN L FURROW.(FURROW, JUSTIN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley M. Davis on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Bradley M. Davis added to party HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC(pty:dft) (Davis, Bradley)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JUSTIN L FURROW on behalf of All Defendants Attorney JUSTIN L FURROW added to party HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC(pty:dft) (FURROW, JUSTIN)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TRINA DAVIS (ggs)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC. (ggs)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3164619, $400 filed by TRINA DAVIS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(LEACH, CARLOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINA DAVIS
Represented By: CARLOS V LEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: JUSTIN L FURROW
Represented By: Bradley M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?