SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v CRISTEA et al
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: LORENNE CRISTEA and LAURA SHAFER
Case Number: 3:2019cv00064
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/15/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(lap)
September 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Notice (of Filing Certificate of Service) filed by LAURA SHAFER ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE" - No need to refile, docket entry corrected by case manager.(ggs)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CORY SCOTT SIMMONS on behalf of LAURA SHAFER (SIMMONS, CORY)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 ANSWER by LAURA SHAFER (TURCHIN, JASON) Modified on 9/5/2019 to correct event and to link to document. (ggs).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JASON TURCHIN (nop)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by LAURA SHAFER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3254374, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(TURCHIN, JASON)
September 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by LAURA SHAFER ); Generic descriptions of exhibits (i.e. Exhibit, Exhibit A, etc.) are not permitted. Future filings must include a description of exhibits, if any. NO NEED TO REFILE - docket entry corrected by case manager. (ggs)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint(), CROSSCLAIM against LORENNE CRISTEA by LAURA SHAFER with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Separation Agreement)(SIMMONS, CORY)Attorney CORY SCOTT SIMMONS added to party LAURA SHAFER(pty:dft) Modified on 9/5/2019 to add description of exhibit. (ggs).
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. as to LAURA SHAFER (POHLMANN, AARON)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY as to LORENNE CRISTEA. (POHLMANN, AARON)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by LORENNE CRISTEA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Ms. Burgess from Cristian Cosmin Cristea 3/12/2019, #2 Exhibit Letter from J. Boswell 2/26/2019, #3 Exhibit Policies, by Linda Lawrence, #4 Exhibit Last Will and Testament of John Cristea)(ggs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent SOUTHERN CAPITAL BROKERAGE CORPORATION LLC, Other Affiliate ARKANSAS FARM BUREAU INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate FLORIDA FARM BUREAU HOLDING CORPORATION, Other Affiliate GEORGIA FARM BUREAU HOLDING COMPANY INC, Other Affiliate KENTUCKY FARM BUREAU INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate LOUISIANA FARM BUREAU INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MISSISSIPPI FARM BUREAU INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate SOUTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate TEXAS FARM BUREAU INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate VIRGINIA FARM BUREAU HOLDING CORPORATION for Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (POHLMANN, AARON)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (ggs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LORENNE CRISTEA, LAURA SHAFER. (Attachments: #1 Summons LAURA SHAFER)(ggs)
July 17, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
July 17, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint,, filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, corrections made by case manager. (ggs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lorenne Cristea, Laura Shafer Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3213359, $400 filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment Entry/Decree of Divorce, #3 Exhibit C - US Department of STate's Report of Death of a US Citizen or US Non-Citizen National Abroad, #4 Exhibit D - Cristea's Claimant's Statement, #5 Exhibit E - Shafer's Claimant's Statement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(POHLMANN, AARON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v CRISTEA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORENNE CRISTEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA SHAFER
Represented By: JASON TURCHIN
Represented By: CORY SCOTT SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: AARON EDWARD POHLMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?