THROWER v. MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS INC et al
Plaintiff: GENE THROWER
Defendant: MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS INC, AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES CENTER, MICHAEL KASICK and VALIANT AUTO LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00066
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to VALIANT AUTO LLC. (ggs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #1 Summons (CORRECTED)) (ggs).
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL KASICK. (ggs)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANTHONY I PARONICH (nop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GENE THROWER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3266316, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(PARONICH, ANTHONY)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL ANTHONY I PARONICH, and ANDREW HEIDARPOUR - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing First Amended Complaint by GENE THROWER re #7 Amended Complaint/Petition (PARONICH, ANTHONY)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS INC, MICHAEL KASICK, VALIANT AUTO LLC d/b/a AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES CENTER by GENE THROWER (PARONICH, ANTHONY) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/18/2019) (ans).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend/Substitute Party Name. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file the Amended Complaint with the corrected party name. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/16/2019 (lap)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by GENE THROWER filed by ANTHONY I PARONICH.(PARONICH, ANTHONY)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GENE THROWER. as to MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS INC (KOVAL, STEVEN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to GENE THROWER (ggs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS INC. (ggs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3220814, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons FOR MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS, INC.)(KOVAL, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THROWER v. MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENE THROWER
Represented By: STEVEN H KOVAL
Represented By: ANDREW HEIDARPOUR
Represented By: ANTHONY I PARONICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATRIX WARRANTY SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KASICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALIANT AUTO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?