HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY v. LAMBE et al
Plaintiff: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: LELA LAMBE and JAMES LAMBE
Case Number: 3:2019cv00083
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/30/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/18/2019. (ggs)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent HARTFORD LIFE INC, Corporate Parent HARTFORD HOLDINGS INC, Corporate Parent THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC for HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (CROW, NIKOLE)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by LELA LAMBE.(HUESTIS, ROBERT), Attorney ROBERT S HUESTIS added to party LELA LAMBE(pty:dft) Modified on 11/14/2019 to remove filing party JAMES LAMBE and the attorney association for this defendant.(ggs).
November 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
November 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Complaint filed by JAMES LAMBE, LELA LAMBE ); During the filing process, counsel apparently selected both defendants as the filing parties for this Answer, thereby adding himself as counsel for both defendants. The Answer appears to pertain to ONLY Defendant LELA LAMBE and the signature block indicates that counsel represents only LELA LAMBE. Case manager is making the necessary corrections to the docket entry and removing the attorney-client association as to Defendant JAMES LAMBE.(ggs)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Consent Stipulation for Defendant Lela Lambe to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint in Interpleader re #1 Complaint,, by LELA LAMBE (HUESTIS, ROBERT)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by LELA LAMBE. Acknowledgment filed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (CROW, NIKOLE) Modified on 10/23/2019 to add name of defendant served. (ggs).
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by JAMES LAMBE Acknowledgment filed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (CROW, NIKOLE) Modified on 10/23/2019 to add name of defendant served.(ggs).
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JAMES LAMBE. (ggs)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LELA LAMBE. (ggs)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3271975, $400 filed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Group Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Booklet-Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Proceeds of Insurance, #5 Exhibit E - Proof of Death Form, #6 Exhibit F - 05.16.19 Email, #7 Exhibit G - 05.17.19 Letter, #8 Exhibit H - Beneficiary Affidavit, #9 Exhibit I - Life Claim Form, #10 Exhibit J - 07.03.19 Letter, #11 Exhibit K - Civil Judgment, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons Lela Lambe, #14 Summons James Lambe)(CROW, NIKOLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY v. LAMBE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LELA LAMBE
Represented By: ROBERT S HUESTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LAMBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: NIKOLE MARIE CROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?