EDWARDS v. LAUGHLIN
Petitioner: OMAR EDWARDS
Respondent: WARDEN VANCE LAUGHLIN
Case Number: 3:2019cv00097
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by OMAR EDWARDS; ORDER to Amend Petition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by OMAR EDWARDS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 12/17/2019. (ggs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE With Regard to Filing of Pleadings and Other Papers sent to OMAR EDWARDS. (ggs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by OMAR EDWARDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for the Petitioner to pay the $5.00 filing fee or to submit a properly completed motion to proceed IFP within 21 days of the date of this Order. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 11/27/19. (sbd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by OMAR EDWARDS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by OMAR EDWARDS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst VANCE LAUGHLIN filed by OMAR EDWARDS (Attachments: #1 Amendment to Original Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Suprior Court of Wheeler County), #2 Supreme Court of Georgia Order 8-5-2019, #3 Inmate Mail History, #4 Statement of Omar Edwards, #5 Envelope)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARDS v. LAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OMAR EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN VANCE LAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?