NELSON v. JACKSON et al
Plaintiff: BRETT-ANDREW NELSON
Defendant: KERI ANN YODER, ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, DONALD CORWIN JACKSON and LORI BETH TALBOT
Case Number: 3:2020cv00028
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED by USMS for ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, DONALD CORWIN JACKSON, LORI BETH TALBOT, KERI ANN YODER (ggs)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, DONALD CORWIN JACKSON, LORI BETH TALBOT, KERI ANN YODER. Main Document - USM285 DONALD CORWIN JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 LORI BETH TALBOT, #2 USM 285 ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, #3 USM 285 KERI ANN YODER)(ggs)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, DONALD CORWIN JACKSON, LORI BETH TALBOT, KERI ANN YODER. Main Document - Summons DONALD CORWIN JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons LORI BETH TALBOT, #2 Summons ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, #3 Summons KERI ANN YODER)(ggs)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as premature #5 Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting #6 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Court ORDERS the United States Marshal to serve a copy of both the Complaint and the Amended Complaint on Defendants. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 4/15/2020 (lap)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED #1 Motion/Complaint to Confirm Foreign Judgment Award, against All Defendants by BRETT-ANDREW NELSON (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet - Identity of Parties, #2 Final Arbitration Award, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Envelope)(ggs)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Filed by BRETT-ANDREW NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Show Cause Filed by BRETT-ANDREW NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enter Judgment upon ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, LORI BETH TALBOT, KERI ANN YODER, and DONALD CORWIN JACKSON, filed by BRETT-ANDREW NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BRETT-ANDREW NELSON (ggs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by BRETT-ANDREW NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT / PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND TO ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. against ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER, DONALD CORWIN JACKSON, LORI BETH TALBOT, KERI ANN YODER, filed by BRETT-ANDREW NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Final Arbitration Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum, #5 Envelope)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. JACKSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERI ANN YODER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY MORGAN BURGEMEISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD CORWIN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI BETH TALBOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT-ANDREW NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?