SOROKA v. SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC, et al
Plaintiff: SONIA L SOROKA
Defendant: SUSANNE TAYLOR, SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC and MICHALE WAYNE CAMPBELL
Case Number: 3:2020cv00036
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SONIA L SOROKA. as to MICHALE WAYNE CAMPBELL (PEARSON, TODD)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Request of Waiver of Service - Defendant Campbell by SONIA L SOROKA (PEARSON, TODD)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ALYCE B OGUNSOLA on behalf of SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC, SUSANNE TAYLOR Attorney ALYCE B OGUNSOLA added to party SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ALYCE B OGUNSOLA added to party SUSANNE TAYLOR(pty:dft) (OGUNSOLA, ALYCE)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROBERT A LUSKIN on behalf of SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC, SUSANNE TAYLOR Attorney ROBERT A LUSKIN added to party SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT A LUSKIN added to party SUSANNE TAYLOR(pty:dft) (LUSKIN, ROBERT)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SONIA L SOROKA. as to SUSANNE TAYLOR (PEARSON, TODD)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SONIA L SOROKA. as to SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC (PEARSON, TODD)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Request of Waiver of Service by SONIA L SOROKA (PEARSON, TODD)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MICHALE WAYNE CAMPBELL. (ggs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SUSANNE TAYLOR. (ggs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC. (ggs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against SONIA L SOROKA filed by SONIA L SOROKA (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Southland Process Group, LLC, #3 Summons Summons - Susanne Taylor, #4 Summons Summons - Michael Campbell)(MOLDEN, REGINA)
March 16, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Sonia L. Soroka ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Party names corrected by case manager. (ggs)
March 16, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Sonia L. Soroka ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. Please use the "COMPLAINT (IFP)" to avoid paying the filing fee again. (ggs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sonia L. Soroka Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3417818, $400 filed by Sonia L. Soroka (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Civil Summons - Southland Process Group, LLC, #3 Summons Civil Summons - Susanne Taylor, #4 Summons Civil Summons - Michael Wayne Campbell)(PEARSON, TODD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOROKA v. SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONIA L SOROKA
Represented By: TODD ORLANDO PEARSON
Represented By: REGINA S MOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSANNE TAYLOR
Represented By: ROBERT A LUSKIN
Represented By: ALYCE B OGUNSOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHLAND PROCESS GROUP LLC
Represented By: ROBERT A LUSKIN
Represented By: ALYCE B OGUNSOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHALE WAYNE CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?