FREY v. BAYER CORPORATION, et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY FREY
Defendant: BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER ESSURE INC and BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00041
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 17 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER terminating #8 Motion to Dismiss as moot in light of the Amended Complaint; granting #16 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery in this action is stayed pending resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/12/2020 (CCL)
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC filed by Christopher Grey Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Staying Discovery)(Campbell, Christopher)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sandobal v. Bayer Corp., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Medali v. Bayer HealthCare LLC, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Lance v. Bayer Essure Inc., #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - In re Essure Prod. Cases, JCCP No. 4887, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - FDA, What is a Medical Device Recall?, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - PMA Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Summary of Safety and Effectiveness Data for Essure, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Essure Regulatory History, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - 2002 Instructions for Use, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Essure System PMA Supplements, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - 2013 Instructions for Use, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - 2012 Patient Information Booklet)(Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 5/11/2020 (ggs).
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #12 Amended Complaint/Petition : by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC filed by Christopher Grey Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Bayer's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Campbell, Christopher)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by KIMBERLY FREY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted against Defendants (ORREN, MATTHEW)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by KIMBERLY FREY (ORREN, MATTHEW)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Sandobal v. Bayer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Medali v. Bayer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Noris v. Bayer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Lance v. Bayer, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E In re Essure Prod. Case JCCP No. 4887, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F In re Essure Prod. Cases JCCP No. 4887, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G In re Essure Prod. Cases JCCP No. 4887, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H FDA, What is a Medical Device Recall?, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I PMA Order, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J Summary of Safety and Effectiveness Data, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K Regulatory History, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L 2002 Instructions for Use, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M PMA Supplements, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N 2013 Instructions for Use, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O 2008 Patient Information Booklet, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P 2012 Patient Information Booklet)(Campbell, Christopher)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Jurisdictional Statement by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Campbell, Christopher)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC identifying Corporate Parent BAYER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate BAYER CORPORATION for BAYER ESSURE INC; Corporate Parent BAYER HEALTHCARE US FUNDING LLC, Corporate Parent MIRALAX LLC, Corporate Parent BAYER SAMSON I LLC, Corporate Parent BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent BAYER WEST COAST CORPORATION, Corporate Parent BAYER ESSURE INC., Corporate Parent NIPPONEX INC., Corporate Parent BAYER MEDICAL CARE INC., Other Affiliate SCHERING BERLIN INC., Other Affiliate BAYER EAST COAST LLC, Other Affiliate BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Other Affiliate BAYER CORPORATION for BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC; Corporate Parent SCHERING BERLIN INC., Other Affiliate BAYER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate BAYER CORPORATION for BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC; Corporate Parent BAYER US HOLDING LP, Other Affiliate BAYER PHARMA AG, Other Affiliate BAYER WORLD INVESTMENTS B.V., Other Affiliate BAYER SOLUTION B.V., Other Affiliate BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG, Other Affiliate BAYER US II GMBH & CO. KG, Other Affiliate BAYER US AG & CO. KG, Other Affiliate BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, Other Affiliate BAYER US IP GMBH, Other Affiliate BAYER AG for BAYER CORPORATION. (Campbell, Christopher)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted against Defendants by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC filed by Christopher Grey Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Bayer's Motion to Dismiss)(Campbell, Christopher)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIMBERLY FREY as to BAYER ESSURE INC.(ORREN, MATTHEW) Modified on 4/9/2020 to edit docket text to specify party served. (ggs).
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIMBERLY FREY as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AOS Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #2 Affidavit AOS Bayer Healthcare, LLC)(ORREN, MATTHEW)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (ggs)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC. (ggs)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BAYER ESSURE INC. (ggs)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BAYER CORPORATION. (ggs)
March 24, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Kimberly Frey ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, the "Nature of Suit" box for "245 Tort Product Liability" was not checked on the civil cover sheet. NO NEED TO REFILE. Corrections to party names made by case manager. (ggs)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Frey Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3426135, $400 filed by Kimberly Frey (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons-Bayer Corporation, #3 Summons Summons-Bayer Essure, Inc., #4 Summons Summons-Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #5 Summons Summons- Bayer Healthcare, LLC)(ORREN, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREY v. BAYER CORPORATION, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher Grey Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC
Represented By: Christopher Grey Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER ESSURE INC
Represented By: Christopher Grey Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: Christopher Grey Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY FREY
Represented By: MATTHEW ORREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?