BRYANT v. TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC et al
Plaintiff: QYNNISHA BRYANT
Defendant: SANDRA GARDNER, TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC and DARNELL LEWIS GARDNER
Case Number: 3:2020cv00061
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Certify Class by QYNNISHA BRYANT filed by THOMAS JOSEPH MEW, IV. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification, #2 Proposed Order for Conditional Certification)(MEW, THOMAS)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/13/2020. Ordered by District Judge CLAY D LAND on 7/2/2020. (ggs)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DARNELL LEWIS GARDNER, SANDRA GARDNER, TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC (MCARTHUR, JOHN)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by DARNELL LEWIS GARDNER, SANDRA GARDNER, TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC.(MCARTHUR, JOHN)Attorney JOHN JAY MCARTHUR added to party DARNELL LEWIS GARDNER(pty:dft), Attorney JOHN JAY MCARTHUR added to party SANDRA GARDNER(pty:dft), Attorney JOHN JAY MCARTHUR added to party TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC(pty:dft)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by GREGG C GREENBERG (nop)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by QYNNISHA BRYANT Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3484518, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Thomas J. Mew 503447. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(MEW, THOMAS)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QYNNISHA BRYANT as to SANDRA GARDNER. (MEW, THOMAS)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QYNNISHA BRYANT as to DARNELL LEWIS GARDNER. (MEW, THOMAS)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QYNNISHA BRYANT as to TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC. (MEW, THOMAS)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DARNELL LEWIS GARDNER, SANDRA GARDNER, TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons D. Gardner, #2 Summons S. Gardner)(ggs)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL GREGG C GREENBERG - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Consent to Join Action (FLSA) (MEW, THOMAS)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3480718, $400 filed by QYNNISHA BRYANT (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons as to Toppers Int, #3 Summons Summons as to Darnell Gardner, #4 Summons Summons as to Sandra Gardner)(MEW, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYANT v. TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QYNNISHA BRYANT
Represented By: THOMAS JOSEPH MEW, IV
Represented By: GREGG C GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA GARDNER
Represented By: JOHN JAY MCARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOPPERS INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: JOHN JAY MCARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARNELL LEWIS GARDNER
Represented By: JOHN JAY MCARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?