RUARK et al v. STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOEL P RUARK and JACQUIE RUARK
Defendant: WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC, STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC, MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC, HOLBROOK & WALKER INC and GDP HOLDINGS LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00097
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Answer to Complaint filed by WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(ggs)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC.(Foster, Richard)Attorney Richard C. Foster added to party WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC(pty:dft)
October 19, 2020 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by GRAHAM K BRANTLEY (nop)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC (JONES, KWENDE)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC (JONES, KWENDE)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC with Jury Demand.(JONES, KWENDE)Attorney KWENDE B JONES added to party STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC(pty:dft)
October 16, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL GRAHAM K BRANTLEY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(ggs)
October 16, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Answer to Complaint filed by STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC, #13 Jury Demand filed by STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC ); Notice to Counsel - ELIZABETH B. DAVIS Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Specifically, your address and telephone number. Please update your contact information via PACER.(ggs)
October 16, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Answer to Complaint filed by STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(ggs)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC (REEVES, R)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: July 2, 2020 Letter to Donald Stack, Esq.)(REEVES, R)Attorney R MATTHEW REEVES added to party MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC(pty:dft)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOLBROOK & WALKER INC (WILBANKS, DYLAN)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by HOLBROOK & WALKER INC with Jury Demand.(WILBANKS, DYLAN)Attorney DYLAN E WILBANKS added to party HOLBROOK & WALKER INC(pty:dft)
October 13, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #8 Answer to Complaint filed by HOLBROOK & WALKER INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(ggs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOEL P RUARK, JACQUIE RUARK as to WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC. (STACK, DONALD)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME re #1 Complaint,, by MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC (REEVES, R)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOEL P RUARK, JACQUIE RUARK as to STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC. (STACK, DONALD)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOEL P RUARK, JACQUIE RUARK as to HOLBROOK & WALKER INC. (STACK, DONALD)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOEL P RUARK, JACQUIE RUARK as to MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC. (STACK, DONALD)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GDP HOLDINGS LLC, HOLBROOK & WALKER INC, MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC, STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC, WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons GDP HOLDINGS LLC, #2 Summons HOLBROOK & WALKER INC, #3 Summons MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC, #4 Summons WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC)(ggs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3557862, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Sue to GDP Holdings LLC 09-18-2019, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Supplemental 60-day Notice of Intent to Sue to Starlight Homes Georgia, LLC 10-07-19, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Supplemental 60-day Notice and Demand 5-14-20, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(STACK, DONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUARK et al v. STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATKINS EROSION CONTROL INC
Represented By: Richard C. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARLIGHT HOMES GEORGIA LLC
Represented By: KWENDE B JONES
Represented By: ELIZABETH B DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MQ DEVELOPMENTS LLC
Represented By: R MATTHEW REEVES
Represented By: GRAHAM K BRANTLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLBROOK & WALKER INC
Represented By: DYLAN E WILBANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDP HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL P RUARK
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUIE RUARK
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?