CREASMAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: TERESA CREASMAN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00024
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (ggs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2021: #1 USM 285 Office of the Regional Chief Counsel and U.S. Attorney General) (ggs).
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. ATTORNEY (CIVIL PROCESS CLERK). (ggs)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. ATTORNEY, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL (ggs)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ggs)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by USMS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3-19-21. (jdl)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TERESA CREASMAN (ggs)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TERESA CREASMAN filed by HARRIS RAY MASON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM 285, #7 USM 285, #8 USM 285). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(MASON, HARRIS)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by TERESA CREASMAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC DENIAL, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MASON, HARRIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CREASMAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA CREASMAN
Represented By: HARRIS RAY MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?