WISE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURIITY
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURIITY and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00030
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. ATTORNEY. (ggs)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (ggs)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. ATTORNEY (ggs)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and U.S. ATTORNEY (ggs)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ggs)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot #4 Amended Motion; finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by USMS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-8-21. (jdl)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE filed by GEORGE C PIEMONTE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION Amending #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE filed by GEORGE C PIEMONTE. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order)(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE (ggs)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE filed by GEORGE C PIEMONTE. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURIITY filed by CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #4 Summons Attorney General)(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
April 1, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE ); Document is not a legible document (some pages are very small). Document must be properly scanned and refiled. (ggs)
April 1, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 AMENDED MOTION filed by CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE ); Document is not a properly scanned pdf document with blurry areas. Document must be properly and clearly scanned and refiled.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WISE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURIITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER RICHARD WISE
Represented By: GEORGE C PIEMONTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURIITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?