CHITWOOD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: CAROL ANN CHITWOOD
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00041
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney (Civil Process Clerk) and U.S. Attorney General (ggs)
May 6, 2021 Filing Fee (IFP Denied) Paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3789554, $402 (GOWEN, DEBORAH)
May 3, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. All parties having consented pursuant to 28 USC 636(c)(1) for a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct any and all proceedings in connection with this action, including but not limited to, the trial of said case and the ordering of the entry of judgment herein; this case is hereby reassigned to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES for all further proceedings. (ggs)
May 2, 2021 Filing 6 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (GOWEN, DEBORAH)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CAROL ANN CHITWOOD (vs)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-29-21. (rcg)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CAROL ANN CHITWOOD filed by DEBORAH LOUISE GOWEN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Proposed Order, #6 USM 285, #7 USM 285, #8 USM 285). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(GOWEN, DEBORAH)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by CAROL ANN CHITWOOD (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit AC DENIAL)(GOWEN, DEBORAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHITWOOD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL ANN CHITWOOD
Represented By: DEBORAH LOUISE GOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?