COOK v. PHILBIN
Petitioner: DANIEL DELANE COOK
Respondent: WARDEN EDWARD PHILBIN
Case Number: 3:2021cv00087
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Courts Order. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 8/27/2021. (ggs)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to File Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy) or to pay the filing fee within 14 days of the date of this Order. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 7/28/2021. (ggs)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02805. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this action, including all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings, and exhibits filed herein (if any), is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, the Athens Division, for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D. Cannon on 7/22/2021. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 7/22/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Regina D. Cannon terminated from case. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 7/22/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE. (ggs)
July 14, 2021 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (bdb) [Transferred from gand on 7/22/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Delane Cook. (Attachments: #1 Petition for a Writ, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 7/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. PHILBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANIEL DELANE COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN EDWARD PHILBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?